Connecticut District Court
Case #: 3:21-cr-00156
Case Filed:Sep 14, 2021
Last checked: Friday Sep 17, 2021 3:21 AM EDT
Defendant
Laderrick Jones (8)
Defendant
Tavaughn Wright (15)
Defendant
Dayquain Sinisterra (11)
Defendant
Julian Scott (10)
Defendant
Gabriel Pulliam (1)
Defendant
Jaivaun McKnight (9)
Represented By
Robert Gerard Golger
Russo & Rizio, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Zaekwon McDaniel (3)
Defendant
Tahjay Love (2)
Defendant
Ahmed Alves (12)
Represented By
Richard S. Cramer
Law Offices Of Richard S. Cramer
contact info
Defendant
James Graham (14)
Defendant
Adrian Flemming (13)
Defendant
Justin Cabrera (7)
Represented By
Tracy Hayes
Federal Public Defender'S Office - Nh
contact info
Defendant
D'Andre Burrus (6)
Defendant
Dimitri Blanding (16)
Represented By
William T. Koch, Jr.
Koch & Koch
contact info
Defendant
Malik Bayon (5)
Represented By
Steven B. Rasile
Law Offices Of Mirto & Rasile, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Ezra Alves (4)
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
John Trowbridge Pierpont
Us Attorney'S Office - Ct
contact info
Don E. Therkildsen, Jr.
State'S Attorney'S Office
contact info
Natasha Freismuth
U.S. Attorney'S Office-Nh
contact info
Geoffrey M. Stone
U.S. Attorney'S Office - Htfd
contact info
Leonard C. Boyle
U.S. Attorney'S Office-Nh
contact info

GPO Jan 06 2022
ORDER denying 201 Motion to Modify Conditions of Release as to Dimitri Blanding (16). Signed by Judge Thomas O. Farrish on 1/06/2022. (Geisler, James) Modified on 1/10/2022 to add opinion type (Wood, R.).
GPO Mar 29 2022
ORDER denying without prejudice 214 Motion to Sever Defendant as to Tavaughn Wright (15). See attached Order. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 3/29/2022. (Gould, K.)
GPO May 10 2022
ORDER granting 227 Motion for permission to obtain laptop devices; granting 237 Motion to Adopt as to Defendants Gabriel Pulliam, Zaekwon McDaniel, Malik Bayon, Justin Cabrera and Jaivaun McKnight. See attached order. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 5/10/2022. (Gould, K.)ORDER granting 227 Motion for permission to obtain laptop devices; granting 237 Motion to Adopt as to Defendants Gabriel Pulliam, Zaekwon McDaniel, Malik Bayon, Justin Cabrera and Jaivaun McKnight. See attached order. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 5/10/2022. (Gould, K.)ORDER granting 227 Motion for permission to obtain laptop devices; granting 237 Motion to Adopt as to Defendants Gabriel Pulliam, Zaekwon McDaniel, Malik Bayon, Justin Cabrera and Jaivaun McKnight. See attached order. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 5/10/2022. (Gould, K.)ORDER granting 227 Motion for permission to obtain laptop devices; granting 237 Motion to Adopt as to Defendants Gabriel Pulliam, Zaekwon McDaniel, Malik Bayon, Justin Cabrera and Jaivaun McKnight. See attached order. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 5/10/2022. (Gould, K.)ORDER granting 227 Motion for permission to obtain laptop devices; granting 237 Motion to Adopt as to Defendants Gabriel Pulliam, Zaekwon McDaniel, Malik Bayon, Justin Cabrera and Jaivaun McKnight. See attached order. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 5/10/2022. (Gould, K.)ORDER granting 227 Motion for permission to obtain laptop devices; granting 237 Motion to Adopt as to Defendants Gabriel Pulliam, Zaekwon McDaniel, Malik Bayon, Justin Cabrera and Jaivaun McKnight. See attached order. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 5/10/2022. (Gould, K.)ORDER granting 227 Motion for permission to obtain laptop devices; granting 237 Motion to Adopt as to Defendants Gabriel Pulliam, Zaekwon McDaniel, Malik Bayon, Justin Cabrera and Jaivaun McKnight. See attached order. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 5/10/2022. (Gould, K.)ORDER granting 227 Motion for permission to obtain laptop devices; granting 237 Motion to Adopt as to Defendants Gabriel Pulliam, Zaekwon McDaniel, Malik Bayon, Justin Cabrera and Jaivaun McKnight. See attached order. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 5/10/2022. (Gould, K.)ORDER granting 227 Motion for permission to obtain laptop devices; granting 237 Motion to Adopt as to Defendants Gabriel Pulliam, Zaekwon McDaniel, Malik Bayon, Justin Cabrera and Jaivaun McKnight. See attached order. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 5/10/2022. (Gould, K.)ORDER granting 227 Motion for permission to obtain laptop devices; granting 237 Motion to Adopt as to Defendants Gabriel Pulliam, Zaekwon McDaniel, Malik Bayon, Justin Cabrera and Jaivaun McKnight. See attached order. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 5/10/2022. (Gould, K.)ORDER granting 227 Motion for permission to obtain laptop devices; granting 237 Motion to Adopt as to Defendants Gabriel Pulliam, Zaekwon McDaniel, Malik Bayon, Justin Cabrera and Jaivaun McKnight. See attached order. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 5/10/2022. (Gould, K.)ORDER granting 227 Motion for permission to obtain laptop devices; granting 237 Motion to Adopt as to Defendants Gabriel Pulliam, Zaekwon McDaniel, Malik Bayon, Justin Cabrera and Jaivaun McKnight. See attached order. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 5/10/2022. (Gould, K.)ORDER granting 227 Motion for permission to obtain laptop devices; granting 237 Motion to Adopt as to Defendants Gabriel Pulliam, Zaekwon McDaniel, Malik Bayon, Justin Cabrera and Jaivaun McKnight. See attached order. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 5/10/2022. (Gould, K.)ORDER granting 227 Motion for permission to obtain laptop devices; granting 237 Motion to Adopt as to Defendants Gabriel Pulliam, Zaekwon McDaniel, Malik Bayon, Justin Cabrera and Jaivaun McKnight. See attached order. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 5/10/2022. (Gould, K.)ORDER granting 227 Motion for permission to obtain laptop devices; granting 237 Motion to Adopt as to Defendants Gabriel Pulliam, Zaekwon McDaniel, Malik Bayon, Justin Cabrera and Jaivaun McKnight. See attached order. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 5/10/2022. (Gould, K.)ORDER granting 227 Motion for permission to obtain laptop devices; granting 237 Motion to Adopt as to Defendants Gabriel Pulliam, Zaekwon McDaniel, Malik Bayon, Justin Cabrera and Jaivaun McKnight. See attached order. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 5/10/2022. (Gould, K.)
GPO Dec 06 2023
ORDER as to 447, Motion for Bill of Particulars by Zaekwon McDaniel. The motion is DENIED as set forth in the attached order. This motion was joined by Defendants McKnight (EFC No. 451) and Burrus (ECF No. 453). To the extent that the joining defendants' motions requested the Court to order a Bill of Particulars, they are also DENIED. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 12/6/2023. (Alquesta, Steven)ORDER as to 447, Motion for Bill of Particulars by Zaekwon McDaniel. The motion is DENIED as set forth in the attached order. This motion was joined by Defendants McKnight (EFC No. 451) and Burrus (ECF No. 453). To the extent that the joining defendants' motions requested the Court to order a Bill of Particulars, they are also DENIED. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 12/6/2023. (Alquesta, Steven)ORDER as to 447, Motion for Bill of Particulars by Zaekwon McDaniel. The motion is DENIED as set forth in the attached order. This motion was joined by Defendants McKnight (EFC No. 451) and Burrus (ECF No. 453). To the extent that the joining defendants' motions requested the Court to order a Bill of Particulars, they are also DENIED. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 12/6/2023. (Alquesta, Steven)
GPO Dec 06 2023
ORDER as to 463, Motion to Suppress by Zaekwon McDaniel. Defendant McDaniel's motion to suppress evidence contained in his "Motion to Adopt and Join" at ECF No. 463 is DENIED as set forth in the attached order. This motion was joined by Defendant Scott in ECF No. 464. To the extent that Defendant Scott's Motion at ECF No. 464 requests suppression of evidence extracted from Defendant McDaniel's cell phone, it is also DENIED. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 12/6/2023. (Alquesta, Steven)ORDER as to 463, Motion to Suppress by Zaekwon McDaniel. Defendant McDaniel's motion to suppress evidence contained in his "Motion to Adopt and Join" at ECF No. 463 is DENIED as set forth in the attached order. This motion was joined by Defendant Scott in ECF No. 464. To the extent that Defendant Scott's Motion at ECF No. 464 requests suppression of evidence extracted from Defendant McDaniel's cell phone, it is also DENIED. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 12/6/2023. (Alquesta, Steven)
GPO Feb 27 2024
ORDER denying 437 Motion to Suppress as to Jaivaun McKnight. See attached memorandum of decision. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 2/27/2024. (Alquesta, S)
GPO Mar 01 2024
ORDER denying 448 Motion to Suppress as to Dayquain Sinisterra (11). See attached Order. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 3/1/2024. (Gould, K.)
GPO Mar 15 2024
ORDER denying 754 Motion for Daubert Hearing and Objection to Government's Notice of Toolmark/Firearm Experts as to Gabriel Pulliam (1). See attached Order. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 3/15/2024. (Chambers, J.)
GPO Jan 02 2025
ORDER denying 666 Motion for Acquittal as to James Graham (14); denying 673 Motion for Acquittal as to James Graham (14); denying 690 Motion for Acquittal as to James Graham (14). See attached order. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 1/2/2025. (Gould, K)
GPO Apr 15 2025
ORDER denying 666 Motion for Acquittal as to Tahjay Love (2), Zaekwon McDaniel (3), Malik Bayon (5); denying 673 Motion for Acquittal as to Tahjay Love (2); denying 695 Motion for Acquittal as to Tahjay Love (2); denying 974 Motion for Acquittal as to Tahjay Love (2); denying 672 Motion for Acquittal as to Zaekwon McDaniel (3); denying 748 Motion for Acquittal as to Zaekwon McDaniel (3); denying 749 Motion for Acquittal as to Malik Bayon (5); denying 749 Motion for New Trial as to Malik Bayon (5). See attached Order. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 4/15/2025. (Gould, K)ORDER denying 666 Motion for Acquittal as to Tahjay Love (2), Zaekwon McDaniel (3), Malik Bayon (5); denying 673 Motion for Acquittal as to Tahjay Love (2); denying 695 Motion for Acquittal as to Tahjay Love (2); denying 974 Motion for Acquittal as to Tahjay Love (2); denying 672 Motion for Acquittal as to Zaekwon McDaniel (3); denying 748 Motion for Acquittal as to Zaekwon McDaniel (3); denying 749 Motion for Acquittal as to Malik Bayon (5); denying 749 Motion for New Trial as to Malik Bayon (5). See attached Order. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 4/15/2025. (Gould, K)ORDER denying 666 Motion for Acquittal as to Tahjay Love (2), Zaekwon McDaniel (3), Malik Bayon (5); denying 673 Motion for Acquittal as to Tahjay Love (2); denying 695 Motion for Acquittal as to Tahjay Love (2); denying 974 Motion for Acquittal as to Tahjay Love (2); denying 672 Motion for Acquittal as to Zaekwon McDaniel (3); denying 748 Motion for Acquittal as to Zaekwon McDaniel (3); denying 749 Motion for Acquittal as to Malik Bayon (5); denying 749 Motion for New Trial as to Malik Bayon (5). See attached Order. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 4/15/2025. (Gould, K)
GPO Apr 16 2025
ORDER denying 496 Motion to Dismiss as to Malik Bayon (5). See attached Order. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 4/16/2025. (Gould, K)

Docket last updated: 09/17/2021 4:34 AM EDT
Tuesday, September 14, 2021
1 1 29 pgs SEALED INDICTMENT returned before Judge Thomas O. Farrish with the signature of the foreperson redacted. Grand jury number H-19-1 Warrant to issue as to Gabriel Pulliam (1) count(s) 1, 16, 17, 18, 19, 26, 27, Tahjay Love (2) count(s) 1, 4-5, 6-7, 25, Zaekwon McDaniel (3) count(s) 1, 4-5, 6-7, 8, 9, Ezra Alves (4) count(s) 1, 12, 13, 14, 15, 22, 23, 26, 30, 32, Malik Bayon (5) count(s) 1, 4-5, 6-7, 26, 30, 33, 34, D'Andre Burrus (6) count(s) 1, 26, Justin Cabrera (7) count(s) 2, 3, Laderrick Jones (8) count(s) 1, 26, 27, 28, Jaivaun McKnight (9) count(s) 1, 12, 13, 26, 30, Julian Scott (10) count(s) 1, 14, 15, 16, 17, 18, 19, 22, 23, Dayquain Sinisterra (11) count(s) 1, 10, 11, 12, 13, 14, 15, 16, 17, 18, 19, 20, 21, 22, 23, Ahmed Alves (12) count(s) 24, 26, Adrian Flemming (13) count(s) 26, 29, James Graham (14) count(s) 25, Tavaughn Wright (15) count(s) 26, 31, 35, 36, Dimitri Blanding (16) count(s) 26, 28. (Nuzzi, Tiffany) Modified on 9/15/2021 to correct file date (Nuzzi, Tiffany).
Related: [-]
2 2 Unredacted document with FOREPERSON'S SIGNATURE regarding Indictment (Sealed)1 as to defendant(s)Gabriel Pulliam, Tahjay Love, Zaekwon McDaniel, Malik Bayon, D'Andre Burrus, Justin Cabrera, Laderrick Jones, Jaivaun McKnight, Julian Scott, Dayquain Sinisterra, Ahmed Alves, Adrian Flemming, James Graham, Tavaughn Wright, Dimitri Blanding, Ezra Alves. Access to the pdf document is restricted pursuant to Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 49.1(e). (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
Related: [-]