Hawaii District Court
Judge:Leslie E Kobayashi
Case #: 1:21-cv-00391
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Sep 16, 2021
Terminated:Oct 19, 2021
Last checked: Monday Mar 14, 2022 11:06 PM HST
Defendant
Wyndham Destinations, Inc.
Plaintiff
Miyoko Mizuno
(email: honhawaiihi@gmail.com) 2022 Algaroba Street, # 4
Honolulu, HI 96826

GPO Sep 28 2021
REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT ; FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION THAT THE DISTRICT COURT GRANT PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES; DISMISS THE COMPLAINT WITHOUT PREJUDICE; AND DENY PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL re 1, 3, 4 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 9/28/2021. Because full consent of the parties is lacking under 28 U.S.C. § 636(c), the Clerk of Court is directed to REASSIGN this case to a district judge. The Court FINDS AND RECOMMENDS that the district court: 1) GRANT Plaintiff's Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees; 2) DISMISS Plaintiff's Complaint WITHOUT PREJUDICE to Plaintiff litigating the First Action, Mizuno v. Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., 21-cv-00379-JAO-KJM; 3) DENY Plaintiff's Request for Appointment of Counsel and accompanying request for an interpreter; and 4) INSTRUCT Plaintiff to provide a copy of the district court's adoption of any of these Findings and Recommendations to her counsel in the First Action. IT IS SO FOUND AND RECOMMENDED. (eta)COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Miyoko Mizuno shall be served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on September 29, 2021.
GPO Oct 19 2021
ORDER ADOPTING MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION re 8 - Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 10/19/2021. (eta)COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Miyoko Mizuno served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on October 19, 2021.

Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM HST
Tuesday, October 19, 2021
11 11 order Judgment - Clerk Tue 10/19 12:06 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT entered on 10/19/2021 pursuant to ECF Nos.8 and10 . (eta) COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Miyoko Mizuno shall be served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
10 10 2 pgs order Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations Order on Findings and Recommendations Tue 10/19 11:48 AM
ORDER ADOPTING MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION re8 - Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 10/19/2021. (eta) COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Miyoko Mizuno served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 28, 2021
9 9 notice Notice of Case Reassignment Tue 09/28 4:35 PM
NOTICE of Case Reassignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 21-00391 LEK-WRP on all further pleadings . (eta) COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Miyoko Mizuno shall be served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Findings and Recommendations Tue 09/28 4:33 PM
REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT ; FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION THAT THE DISTRICT COURT GRANT PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES; DISMISS THE COMPLAINT WITHOUT PREJUDICE; AND DENY PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL re1 ,3 ,4 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 9/28/2021. Because full consent of the parties is lacking under 28 U.S.C. § 636(c), the Clerk of Court is directed to REASSIGN this case to a district judge. The Court FINDS AND RECOMMENDS that the district court: 1) GRANT Plaintiff's Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees; 2) DISMISS Plaintiff's Complaint WITHOUT PREJUDICE to Plaintiff litigating the First Action, Mizuno v. Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., 21-cv-00379-JAO-KJM; 3) DENY Plaintiff's Request for Appointment of Counsel and accompanying request for an interpreter; and 4) INSTRUCT Plaintiff to provide a copy of the district court's adoption of any of these Findings and Recommendations to her counsel in the First Action. IT IS SO FOUND AND RECOMMENDED. (eta) COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Miyoko Mizuno shall be served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 24, 2021
7 7 misc Consent Election Form Fri 09/24 11:15 AM
Consent Election Form (jo)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 16, 2021
6 6 notice Notice (Other) Fri 09/17 11:31 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. YOU MUST COMPLETE AND FILE THE ATTACHED ELECTION FORM. FILING INSTRUCTIONS ATTACHED. While the decision to consent or not to consent to the exercise of jurisdiction by the magistrate judge is entirely voluntarily, the duty to respond to this notice is mandatory. Each party must indicate consent or decline to consent by completing the attached Election Form and filing it with the court no later than twenty-one (21) days after entry of appearance. In the event a dispositive motion is filed prior to the date on which the submission of the Election Form is required, the parties must return the completed Election Form within seven (7) calendar days after the motion is filed. (emt, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Election Form
5 5 1 pgs order Order Setting Rule 16 Fri 09/17 11:23 AM
Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 11/15/2021 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 9/16/2021.(emt, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosures
4 4 motion Appoint Counsel Fri 09/17 11:19 AM
REQUEST for Appointment of Counsel Under the Civil Rights Act of 1964; 42 U.S.C. 2000e-5(f)(1)(B); Declaration in Support of Request - by Plaintiff Miyoko Mizuno(emt, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Request for Japanese interpreter for future court hearing(s)
3 3 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 09/17 11:16 AM
APPLICATION to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs - by Plaintiff Miyoko Mizuno (emt, )
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 09/17 11:13 AM
CIVIL Cover Sheet - by Miyoko Mizuno. (emt, )
Related: [-]
1 1 4 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 09/17 11:09 AM
EMPLOYMENT DISCRIMINATION COMPLAINT against Wyndham Destinations, Inc. - filed by Miyoko Mizuno.(emt, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit List (brief summary of Exhibits A-J),
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Exhibit D,
Att: 6 Exhibit E,
Att: 7 Exhibit F,
Att: 8 Exhibit G,
Att: 9 Exhibit H,
Att: 10 Exhibit I,
Att: 11 Exhibit J,
Att: 12 Exhibit K