Beyuka v. 3M Company, The et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:21-cv-03051 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Sep 22, 2021 |
Last checked: Monday Mar 21, 2022 6:49 AM EDT |
Defendant
Dupont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
|
|
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
|
|
Defendant
Kidde PLC Inc
|
|
Defendant
Kidde Fire Fighting Inc
|
|
Defendant
EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
103 Fairview Park Drive
Elmsford, NY 10523 |
|
Defendant
Does 1 to 100
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company, The
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company FC LLC, The
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
|
|
Defendant
3M Company, The
|
|
Plaintiff
Mickey Beyuka, Jr
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, August 23, 2022 | ||
6 | 6
5
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Tue 08/23 3:28 PM
ORDER This Order Relates to: The Member Cases Listed in Exhibit A. The Defense Leadership's motion to dismiss (Dkt. No. 2537 in case 2:18-mn-02873-RMG; (5) in case 2:21-cv-03051-RMG; (5) in case 2:21-cv-03983-RMG) is GRANTED. All claims brought by plaintiffs in the member cases listed in Exhibit A (Dkt. No. 2537-1) are dismissed without prejudice and subject to reinstatement pursuant to the procedure set forth in CMO No. 5. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 8/23/22.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:21-cv-03051-RMG, 2:21-cv-03983-RMG(sshe, ) |
|
Wednesday, August 17, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Dismiss
Wed 08/17 5:22 PM
MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to Serve Plaintiff Fact Sheets - Banner Legal by Defendants. Response to Motion due by 8/31/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:21-cv-03051-RMG, 2:21-cv-03983-RMG(Dukes, David) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs Who Failed to Serve Executed Plaintiff Fact Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - 1.14.22 Notice of Non-Compliance, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - 4.29.22 Notice of Non-Compliance | ||
Thursday, September 23, 2021 | ||
4 | 4
service
Certificate of Service
Thu 09/23 2:38 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mickey Beyuka, Jr(Shafer, Jeremy) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Wednesday, September 22, 2021 | ||
3 | 3
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Wed 09/22 4:55 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-filed), Beyuka v. 3M et al, as DSC case 2:21-cv-3051-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Northern California (San Jose Division) (sshe, ) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Wed 09/22 4:54 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, ) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 09/22 4:53 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0420-10086124.), filed by Mickey Beyuka, Jr. Service due by 12/21/2021(sshe, ) |