New Jersey District Court
Judge:Julien Xavier Neals
Referred: Michael A Hammer
Case #: 2:21-cv-17830
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:1981 Job Discrimination (Race)
Case Filed:Sep 30, 2021
Terminated:Dec 21, 2021
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 29, 2022 5:04 AM EDT
Defendant
FIRSTENERGY CORP.
Plaintiff
BRANDON LAMONT BATTEE
Represented By
CLIFFORD D. DAWKINS, JR
Dawkins & Warrington Law Group LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 28 minutes ago
Tuesday, December 21, 2021
5 5 2 pgs order Order of Dismissal Tue 12/21 11:18 AM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE re4 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Julien Xavier Neals on 12/21/2021. (bt, )
Related: [-]
Monday, December 20, 2021
4 4 2 pgs notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (aty) Mon 12/20 10:28 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal (Stipulated by Defendant) by BRANDON LAMONT BATTEE (DAWKINS, CLIFFORD)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 26, 2021
3 3 1 pgs service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 10/26 5:17 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BRANDON LAMONT BATTEE. FIRSTENERGY CORP. waiver sent on 10/22/2021, answer due 12/21/2021.(DAWKINS, CLIFFORD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Monday, October 04, 2021
2 2 service Summons Issued Mon 10/04 10:33 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to FIRSTENERGY CORP.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (bt, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 30, 2021
1 1 32 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 09/30 11:09 AM
COMPLAINT against FIRSTENERGY CORP. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12850830) with JURY DEMAND, filed by Brandon Lamont Battee.(DAWKINS, CLIFFORD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 1 pgs Exhibit Diagnosis from Dr. Adisa Alghali,
Att: 3 3 pgs Exhibit FirstEnergy Service Animal Policy,
Att: 4 2 pgs Exhibit Prescription from JoAnne Piaggio
qc QC - Attorney Case Opening Thu 09/30 11:27 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Party Information - Parties are to be entered in all capital letters . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jr)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 09/30 11:33 AM
Case assigned to Judge Julien Xavier Neals and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. (jr)
Related: [-]