Greer v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Consolidated
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Robin L Rosenberg |
Case #: | 9:21-cv-81839 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship) |
Case Filed: | Sep 30, 2021 |
Terminated: | Oct 07, 2021 |
Case in other court: | Tennessee Eastern, 1:21-cv-00212 |
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 29, 2022 4:45 AM EDT |
Defendant
Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Treva lynn Greer
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, September 26, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
order
MDL 2924 Final Judgment
Tue 09/26 3:43 PM
RULE 58 FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 9/26/2023. See attached document for full details. (jmd) |
|
Thursday, October 07, 2021 | ||
13 | 13
order
Administrative Order
Thu 10/07 11:41 AM
ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 10/7/2021. See attached document for full details. (mc) |
|
Thursday, September 30, 2021 | ||
11 | 11 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg. (mc) | |
10 | 10
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer - CV - NO FEE
Thu 09/30 11:49 AM
Case transferred in from Tennessee Eastern; Case Number 1:21-cv-00212. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(mc) |
|
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Thu 09/30 11:53 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg. (mc) |
||
transfer
MDL Tag-Along/Transfer In Case Receipt
Thu 09/30 3:54 PM
MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Eastern District of Tennessee. Case Number 1:21-cv-00212 with documents 1-9. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:21-cv-81839-RLR Greer v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. on 9/30/2021. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 77. Clerks Note: JPML notified (mc) |
||
Tuesday, September 28, 2021 | ||
9 | 9 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-77) transferring case to the Southern District of Florida. (GRE) | |
8 | 8 RELATED CASE ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 9/28/21. (GRE) | |
District Judge Travis R McDonough and Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee added. (GRE) | ||
Monday, September 27, 2021 | ||
7 | 7 Notice of Attorney Withdrawal Attorney John Michael Allen terminated. (Frazer, Thomas) | |
Thursday, September 23, 2021 | ||
6 | 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Pro Hac Vice Applications by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Etchells, Kelly) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Monday, September 20, 2021 | ||
5 | 5 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Julia Zousmer re4 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac). Labeled "Not Deliverable as Addressed" (AML) | |
Friday, September 10, 2021 | ||
4 | 4 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) (BJL)Mailed to Attorneys Andrew Bayman, Julia Zousmer and TaCara Harris | |
3 | 3 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) (BJL)*Mailed to John Michael Allen | |
2 | 2 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Etchells, Kelly) Modified on 9/10/2021 (BJL). Added Corporate Parent - Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation to Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Role - dft Added Corporate Parent - Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation to Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Role - dft | |
Case referred to Judge Lee for a related case determination (see 1:21-cv-24). (GRE) | ||
NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Certificate of Corporate Interest as required by FRCP 7.1 by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc..*Please filed the Certificate of Corporate Interest using: Civil Events -Other Filings - Other Documents- Certificate of Corporate Interest. (BJL) | ||
Thursday, September 09, 2021 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hamilton Co., TN Circuit, case number 20C909. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNEDC-4838785), filed by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Etchells, Kelly) | |
Att: 1 Civil Case Coversheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B part 1, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit B part 2, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit B part 3, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit B part 4, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit C | ||
This case has been referred for a related case order (BJL) |