Johnson v. 3M Company, Inc.
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:21-cv-03213 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Oct 01, 2021 |
Case in other court: | Alabama Middle, 1:21-cv-00622 |
Last checked: Thursday Mar 31, 2022 5:37 AM EDT |
Defendant
3M Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Walter Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, August 22, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Thu 08/22 9:34 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Franklin Monroe Greene, Walter Johnson Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:21-cv-03213-RMG, 2:24-cv-00848-RMG(Summerlin, Amanda) |
|
Monday, August 19, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 08/19 12:51 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiffs of Dismissal without Prejudice of entire case (Summerlin, Amanda) Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:21-cv-03213-RMG QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE Clerk refiled as of original filing date in lead and spread to member case as per CMO No. 1 Filing instructions.(sshe, ) |
|
Thursday, October 14, 2021 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 10/14 9:28 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Richard H Taylor on behalf of Walter Johnson Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:21-cv-03213-RMG(Taylor, Richard) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 10/14 9:21 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda D Summerlin on behalf of Walter Johnson Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:21-cv-03213-RMG(Summerlin, Amanda) |
|
Monday, October 04, 2021 | ||
7 | 7
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Mon 10/04 11:38 AM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Alabama Middle, 1:21-cv-00622, Johnson v. 3M Company, as DSC case 2:21-cv-03213-RMG. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: MDL No. 2:18-mn-2873-RMG (LEAD case) is open as the master docket assigned to Judge Richard M. Gergel, District of South Carolina. This civil action is now associated as a member case. Counsel will be notified by Liaison Counsel re new Case Management Orders and other new documents posted in the lead case. CMO Nos. 1 - 19, (including 2.A, 3.A, 3.B, 3.C, 3.D, 3.E, 3.F, 4, 4.A, 5.A, 5.B, 5.C, 5.D, 5.E, 6.A, 6.B, 6.C, 6.D, 6.E, 10.A, 11.A, 11.B, 13.A, 15.A, 16.A, 16.B, 18.A) govern all cases in the MDL proceedings and can be viewed on the Court's MDL website. Please also read NOTICE (s) TO ALL COUNSEL ASSOCIATED WITH MDL 2873 filed in the Lead case. NOTICE of Hearing: Next Status Conference will be a Telephone Conference set for 9/10/2021 9:00 AM, before Honorable Richard M Gergel. See the District Court's website containing information on the MDL at[LINK:MDL-2873] (sshe, ) |
|
5 | 5
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Mon 10/04 11:35 AM
Case transferred in from District of Alabama Middle; Case Number 1:21-cv-00622. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Friday, October 01, 2021 | ||
4 | 4 Received Certified Copy of Conditional Transfer Order entered on 9/30/2021 by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring this action to USDC for the District of South Carolina. (bes, ) (bes, ). Modified on 10/1/2021 to clarify text to reflect correct Court being transferred to (bes, ). [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 10/4/2021.] | |
Case transferred to US District Court for the District of South Carolina; Electronically transferred via CM/ECF to Clerk. (No PDF attached to this entry) (bes, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 10/4/2021.] | ||
Tuesday, September 21, 2021 | ||
3 | 3 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for 3M Company, Inc. & Walter Johnson. (am, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 10/4/2021.] | |
Friday, September 17, 2021 | ||
2 | 2 Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by 3M Company, Inc. (am, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 10/4/2021.] | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by 3M Company, Inc. from Circuit Court of Houston County, AL, case number 38-CV-2021-900350.00. (Filing fee $402.00 receipt number 4602064696)(am, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 10/4/2021.] | |
Att: 1 State Court Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 4 Notice of Filing to State Court, | ||
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 6 Receipt | ||
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by 3M Company, Inc. (NO PDF - See doc1 ) (am, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 10/4/2021.] | ||
COMPLAINT against 3M Company, Inc., filed by Walter Johnson. (NO PDF - See doc 1 )(am, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 10/4/2021.] | ||
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Walter Johnson. (NO PDF - See doc1 ) (am, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 10/4/2021.] | ||
NOTICE of Filing Notice of Removal by 3M Company, Inc. (NO PDF - See doc1 ) (am, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 10/4/2021.] |