Nevada District Court
Judge:James C Mahan
Referred: Daniel J Albregts
Case #: 2:21-cv-01843
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Oct 05, 2021
Terminated:Jul 17, 2024
Case in other court:Clark County, A-21-841122-B
Last checked: Sunday Apr 03, 2022 2:35 AM PDT
Defendant
Stephen Digiovanni
Represented By
Thomas D Dillard
Olson, Cannon, Gormley, Angulo & Stoberski
contact info
Defendant
Danny Horvat
Represented By
Thomas D Dillard
Olson, Cannon, Gormley, Angulo & Stoberski
contact info
Defendant
Jerome Stueve
Represented By
Thomas D Dillard
Olson, Cannon, Gormley, Angulo & Stoberski
contact info
Defendant
Clark County
Represented By
Thomas D Dillard
Olson, Cannon, Gormley, Angulo & Stoberski
contact info
Plaintiff
Southern Nevada Fire Protection Inc
Represented By
Liane K Wakayama
Hayes Wakayama
contact info
Dale A. Hayes, Jr.
Hayes Wakayama
contact info
Jeremy Douglas Holmes
Hayes Wakayama
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Clark County Department of Building and Fire Prevention
Terminated: 12/16/2021
Represented By
Thomas D Dillard
Olson, Cannon, Gormley, Angulo & Stoberski
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/27/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
37 37 3 pgs order Order on Stipulation ~Util - Terminate Case Wed 07/17 11:53 AM
ORDER Granting36 Stipulation for Dismissal. This case is now closed. See order for details. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/17/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AMMi)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 16, 2024
36 36 motion Stipulation Tue 07/16 9:57 AM
STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL by Defendants Clark County, Stephen Digiovanni, Danny Horvat, Jerome Stueve. (Dillard, Thomas) (dismissal)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 21, 2023
35 35 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation Order Staying Case Wed 06/21 1:23 PM
ORDER Granting34 Stipulation to Stay Case. Case is stayed until further order of this court. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/21/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
Related: [-]
34 34 motion Stipulation Wed 06/21 11:04 AM
First STIPULATION TO STAY CASE Pending Mediation by Plaintiff Southern Nevada Fire Protection Inc. (Wakayama, Liane) (stay) (dispositive)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 10, 2023
33 33 7 pgs order Order on Stipulation Tue 04/11 9:44 AM
ORDER Granting32 Stipulation to Extend Discovery Deadlines. Discovery due by 9/29/2023. Motions due by 11/1/2023. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 11/29/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 4/10/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 07, 2023
32 32 motion Stipulation Fri 04/07 4:57 PM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Fourth Request) to Extend Discovery Deadlines re31 Order on Stipulation,, Scheduling Order, by Defendant Clark County. (Dillard, Thomas) (extend) (discovery)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 19, 2023
31 31 5 pgs order Order on Stipulation Scheduling Order Fri 01/20 8:37 AM
ORDER granting30 Stipulation to extend discovery deadlines; Discovery due by 6/29/2023. Motions due by 8/1/2023. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 8/29/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 1/19/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 18, 2023
30 30 motion Stipulation Wed 01/18 10:16 AM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Third Request) to Extend Discovery Deadlines by Plaintiff Southern Nevada Fire Protection Inc. (Wakayama, Liane) (extend) (discovery)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 04, 2023
29 29 notice Notice Other Wed 01/04 1:31 PM
NOTICE of Change of Firm Name by Southern Nevada Fire Protection Inc.. (Wakayama, Liane)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 19, 2022
28 28 8 pgs order Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Mon 12/19 12:05 PM
ORDER granting22 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. IT IS ORDERED that plaintiff's third and eighth claim be, and the same hereby are, DISMISSED, without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's requests for punitive damages arising out of its state law claims are also DISMISSED, with prejudice. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 12/19/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 10, 2022
27 27 respm Reply Mon 10/10 3:39 PM
REPLY to Response to22 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Defendant Clark County. (Dillard, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 03, 2022
26 26 respm Response Mon 10/03 2:46 PM
RESPONSE to22 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Southern Nevada Fire Protection Inc. Replies due by 10/17/2022.(Wakayama, Liane)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
Friday, September 16, 2022
25 25 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings (non motion deadlines) Fri 09/16 2:17 PM
ORDER granting24 Stipulation Re:22 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Responses due by 10/3/2022. Replies due by 10/10/2022. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 9/16/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
Related: [-]
24 24 motion Stipulation Fri 09/16 11:05 AM
First STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) to File Response to Defendants' Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings by Plaintiff Southern Nevada Fire Protection Inc. (Wakayama, Liane) (extend) (sumjgm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 31, 2022
23 23 4 pgs order Order on Stipulation Scheduling Order Wed 08/31 8:38 AM
ORDER granting21 Stipulation; Discovery due by 3/31/2023. Motions due by 5/3/2023. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 5/31/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 8/31/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 29, 2022
22 22 motion Motion Partial Summary Judgment Mon 08/29 12:03 PM
MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on the Pleadings by Defendant Clark County. Responses due by 9/19/2022. (Dillard, Thomas)
Related: [-]
21 21 motion Stipulation Mon 08/29 10:48 AM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) of Discovery Deadlines re20 Order, by Plaintiff Southern Nevada Fire Protection Inc. (Wakayama, Liane) (extend) (discovery) Modified on 8/29/2022 to link document pursuant to LR IC 2-2(d) (SLD)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 20, 2022
20 20 4 pgs order Order on Stipulation Scheduling Order Mon 05/23 8:41 AM
ORDER granting19 Stipulation; Discovery due by 12/1/2022. Motions due by 1/3/2023. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 1/31/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 5/20/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 19, 2022
19 19 motion Stipulation Thu 05/19 9:50 AM
Proposed STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) of Discovery Deadlines re12 Scheduling Order, by Plaintiff Southern Nevada Fire Protection Inc. (Wakayama, Liane) Modified on 5/19/2022 to link document pursuant to LR IC 2-2(d) (SLD)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 25, 2022
18 18 6 pgs order Order on Stipulated Protective Order Mon 04/25 3:49 PM
PROTECTIVE ORDER. ORDER granting17 Amended Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 4/25/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 22, 2022
17 17 motion Stipulated Protective Order Fri 04/22 11:39 AM
Amended Stipulated Protective Order, Amended STIPULATION Confidentiality Agreement and Protective Order by Defendant Clark County. (Dillard, Thomas) Modified event on 4/22/2022 (SLD)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 08, 2022
16 16 3 pgs order Order on Stipulated Protective Order Fri 04/08 4:20 PM
ORDER denying15 Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 4/8/2022.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 04, 2022
15 15 motion Stipulation Mon 04/04 2:51 PM
STIPULATION Confidentiality Agreement and Protective Order by Defendant Clark County. (Dillard, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 08, 2022
14 14 notice Notice Change of Address Tue 02/08 2:43 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Dale A. Hayes, Jr. (Hayes, Dale)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 12, 2022
13 13 notice Notice AO 85 Consent to Mag Judge Wed 01/12 2:46 PM
NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC § 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website -[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (DRS)
Related: [-]
12 12 7 pgs order Order on Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order Wed 01/12 2:44 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER granting11 AMENDED Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order Discovery due by 9/2/2022. Motions due by 10/3/2022. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 11/2/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 1/12/2022.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 11, 2022
11 11 motion Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order Tue 01/11 4:32 PM
Amended Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Southern Nevada Fire Protection Inc. (Holmes, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 04, 2022
10 10 minord Minute Order Order on Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order Tue 01/04 5:37 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 1/4/2022. ORDER denying 9 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Having reviewed the parties' stipulated discovery plan and scheduling order, the Court finds that it fails to comply with the Local Rules. Despite captioning the plan with "SUBMITTED IN COMPLIANCE WITH LR 26-1(b)," the plan seeks a discovery period in excess of 180 days and fails to include any explanation of why a longer discovery period is necessary. Additionally, the plan fails to state the number of days required for discovery. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the parties stipulated discovery plan (ECF No. 9) is DENIED without prejudice . IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties must submit an amended proposed discovery plan and scheduling order by January 14, 2022. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 23, 2021
9 9 motion Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order Thu 12/23 11:49 AM
Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Southern Nevada Fire Protection Inc. (Holmes, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 16, 2021
8 8 4 pgs order Order on Stipulation Thu 12/16 2:21 PM
ORDER granting7 Stipulation. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Clark County shall be substituted as a Defendant in place of the Clark County Department of Building and Fire Prevention, the Clark County Department of Building and Fire Prevention shall be dismissed without prejudice and the parties have leave to amend the caption accordingly. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 12/16/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 10, 2021
7 7 motion Stipulation Fri 12/10 11:36 AM
STIPULATION to Substitute Clark County in place of Clark County Department of Building and Fire Prevention by Defendants Clark County Department of Building and Fire Prevention, Stephen Digiovanni, Danny Horvat, Jerome Stueve. (Dillard, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 03, 2021
6 6 misc Status Report Wed 11/03 12:34 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendants Clark County Department of Building and Fire Prevention, Stephen Digiovanni, Danny Horvat, Jerome Stueve. (Dillard, Thomas)
Related: [-]
5 5 answer Answer to Petition for Removal Wed 11/03 9:42 AM
ANSWER with Jury Demand re1 Petition for Removal,, DEFENANTS' ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (JURY DEMAND) filed by Clark County Department of Building and Fire Prevention, Stephen Digiovanni, Danny Horvat, Jerome Stueve. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 12/18/2021.(Dillard, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 12, 2021
4 4 misc Statement in Removal Case Tue 10/12 12:30 PM
STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendants Clark County Department of Building and Fire Prevention, Stephen Digiovanni. (Dillard, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 05, 2021
3 3 minord Minute Order Removal Case Tue 10/05 3:37 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan on 10/5/2021. Statement regarding removed action is due by 10/20/2021. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 11/4/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Certificate Interested Parties Tue 10/05 3:22 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Clark County Department of Building and Fire Prevention, Stephen Digiovanni. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Dillard, Thomas)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Petition Removal Tue 10/05 3:18 PM
PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Clark County, Case Number A-21-841122-B, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0978-6655366) by Stephen Digiovanni, Clark County Department of Building and Fire Prevention. Proof of service due by 12/14/2021. (Dillard, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Exhibit D,
Att: 6 Certificate of Service
utility Add and Terminate Attorneys Tue 10/05 3:34 PM
Attorney update in case to Correct Counsel's Entry Error: Attorney Dale A. Hayes, Jr,Jeremy Douglas Holmes for Southern Nevada Fire Protection Inc added. (DRS)
Related: [-]
utility Assign Judges in Civil Case Tue 10/05 3:37 PM
Case randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (DRS)
Related: [-]