California Northern District Court
Judge:Edward M Chen
Case #: 3:21-cv-07819
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 Americans w/ Disabilities Act (ADA)
Case Filed:Oct 06, 2021
Last checked: Monday Apr 04, 2022 2:49 AM PDT
Defendant
Laguna Hayes Partners, LLC
Represented By
Richard J. Morin
Law Office Of Rick Morin, PC
contact info
Defendant
Tried and Truly, LLC
Represented By
Richard J. Morin
Law Office Of Rick Morin, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Brian Whitaker
Represented By
Dennis Jay Price, II
Center For Disability Access
contact info
Prathima Reddy Price
Center For Disability Access
contact info
Amanda Lockhart Seabock
Centery For Disability Access
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, April 14, 2022
15 15 misc Stipulation without Proposed Order Thu 04/14 2:06 PM
STIPULATION for Dismissal pursuant to F.R.CIV.P. 41 (a)(1)(A)(ii) jointly filed by Brian Whitaker.(Seabock, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service
Thursday, February 03, 2022
14 14 notice Notice (Other) Thu 02/03 2:25 PM
NOTICE by Brian Whitaker OF SETTLEMENT AND REQUEST TO VACATE ALL CURRENTLY SET DATES(Seabock, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Certificate/Proof of Service
Wednesday, December 22, 2021
13 13 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Wed 12/22 8:05 AM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Laguna Hayes Partners, LLC, Tried and Truly, LLC (Morin, Richard)
Related: [-]
12 12 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 12/22 8:05 AM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byLaguna Hayes Partners, LLC, Tried and Truly, LLC. (Morin, Richard)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 12/22 8:04 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Richard J. Morin (Morin, Richard)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 12, 2021
10 10 order Case Management Scheduling Order Tue 10/12 8:04 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER IN REASSIGNED CASE: Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/26/2022 01:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. Joint Case Management Statement due by 4/19/2022. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/12/2021. (afmS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 08, 2021
9 9 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 10/08 10:47 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward M. Chen for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 10/8/2021.(anjS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording
Wednesday, October 06, 2021
6 6 Summons Issued as to Laguna Hayes Partners, LLC, Tried and Truly, LLC. (mclS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
5 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order for Cases Asserting Denial of Right of Access under Americans with Disabilities Act. (mclS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/20/2021. (asS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
3 3 Proposed Summons. (Seabock, Amanda)
Related: [-]
2 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Brian Whitaker re1 Complaint (Seabock, Amanda)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-16469683.). Filed byBrian Whitaker.(Seabock, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . As marked in the Civil Cover Sheet, Plaintiff's County of Residence is "Los Angeles". Therefore, in the case opening screen, E-filer sh ould select "Los Angeles" from the drop-down menu as the County Code. E-filer has already been notified many times to select the correct County Code but E-filer has chosen to ignore this. Re:[1-1] Civil Cover Sheet filed by Brian Whitaker. (mclS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]