USA v. State of Mississippi
Original Case: 3:16-cv-00622
Fifth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:21-cr-60772 |
Type | civil rights / united states |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Case Filed: | Oct 06, 2021 |
Terminated: | Sep 20, 2023 |
Last checked: Thursday Sep 21, 2023 6:34 AM CDT |
Amicus Curiae
American Association of People with Disabilities
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
The Arc
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
Mental Health America
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
National Council on Independent Living
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
American Association of Retired Persons
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
American Association of Retired Persons Foundation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
The State of Mississippi
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
United States of America
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Sep 20 2023
PUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [21-60772 Reversed] Judge: EHJ, Judge: LHS, Judge: JCH. Mandate issue date is 11/13/2023 [21-60772] |
Docket last updated: 09/21/2023 6:34 AM CDT |
Wednesday, October 06, 2021 | ||
2 pgs CIVIL RIGHTS CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant State of Mississippi 21-60772 (MCS) |