Henderson v. Harris County
Original Case: 4:18-cv-02052
Fifth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:21-cr-20544 |
Type | civil rights / private |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Oct 06, 2021 |
Terminated: | Oct 12, 2022 |
Last checked: Friday Oct 14, 2022 3:32 AM CDT |
Defendant - Appellee
Harris County, Texas
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Arthur Simon Garduno
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Jean Henderson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Christopher Devonte Henderson
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Oct 12 2022
PUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [21-20544 Affirmed ] Judge: JES , Judge: SKD , Judge: ASO. Mandate issue date is 11/03/2022 [21-20544] |
Docket last updated: 10/14/2022 3:32 AM CDT |
Wednesday, October 06, 2021 | ||
3 pgs CIVIL RIGHTS CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Mr. Christopher Devonte Henderson and Ms. Jean Henderson 21-20544 (RLL) |