Harrison v. Brookhaven Sch Dist
Original Case: 5:20-cv-00136
Fifth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:21-cr-60771 |
Type | civil rights / private |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Case Filed: | Oct 06, 2021 |
Terminated: | Sep 21, 2023 |
Last checked: Friday Sep 22, 2023 6:48 AM CDT |
Amicus Curiae
United States
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Brookhaven School District, City of Brookhaven
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
LaRenda J. Harrison, Ed. D.
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Sep 21 2023
PUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [21-60771 Reversed] Judge: DRW, Judge: KDE, Judge: CTW. Mandate issue date is 10/13/2023 [21-60771] |
Docket last updated: 09/22/2023 6:48 AM CDT |
Wednesday, October 06, 2021 | ||
1 pgs CIVIL RIGHTS CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Ms. LaRenda J. Harrison 21-60771 (AGL) |