Phipps v. Culpepper Company of Fayetteville
Arkansas Western District Court | |
Judge: | Timothy L Brooks |
Case #: | 5:21-cv-05177 |
Nature of Suit | 751 Labor - Family and Medical Leave Act |
Cause | 42:2003 Job Discrimination |
Case Filed: | Oct 07, 2021 |
Terminated: | Jan 06, 2022 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 05, 2022 3:46 AM CDT |
Defendant
Culpepper Company of Fayetteville
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jessica Phipps
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Jan 06 2022
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on January 6, 2022. (tg) |
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, January 06, 2022 | ||
19 | 19
order
Judgment
Thu 01/06 3:14 PM
JUDGMENT dismissing case with prejudice re18 Memorandum Opinion and Order. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on January 6, 2022. (tg) |
|
18 | 18
6
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Thu 01/06 3:10 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on January 6, 2022. (tg) |
|
Wednesday, January 05, 2022 | ||
minutes
Case Management Hearing
Wed 01/05 11:08 AM
TEXT ONLY Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Timothy L. Brooks: Case Management Hearing held on 1/5/2022. (Paula Barden-Court Reporter) (slc) |
||
Thursday, December 30, 2021 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 12/30 1:14 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa Geary on behalf of Culpepper Company of Fayetteville. (Geary, Lisa) |
|
Wednesday, November 17, 2021 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
Wed 11/17 4:15 PM
JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Jessica Phipps. (Burks, Christopher) |
|
Monday, November 15, 2021 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement - Filed by Attorney
Mon 11/15 1:46 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Culpepper Company of Fayetteville. (Hutchinson, Timothy) |
|
Friday, October 22, 2021 | ||
13 | 13
order
Initial Scheduling Order
Fri 10/22 9:04 AM
INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Hearing set for 1/5/2022 10:30 AM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable Timothy L. Brooks. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/2/2021. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on October 22, 2021. (slc) |
|
Thursday, October 21, 2021 | ||
12 | 12
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Thu 10/21 3:59 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Culpepper Company of Fayetteville. (Hutchinson, Timothy) |
|
10 | 10
motion
Leave
Thu 10/21 1:13 PM
MOTION for Leave to File a Reply Brief in Support of its Motion to Dismiss by Culpepper Company of Fayetteville.(Hutchinson, Timothy) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
order
Order on Motion for Leave
Thu 10/21 2:50 PM
TEXT ONLY ORDER granting10 Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief. Defendant is directed to file the Reply as a separate docket entry. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on October 21, 2021. (glk) |
||
Tuesday, October 19, 2021 | ||
9 | 9
respm
Response to Motion
Tue 10/19 10:12 AM
RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Jessica Phipps. (Burks, Christopher) |
|
Friday, October 15, 2021 | ||
8 | 8
7
pgs
msupport
Memorandum Brief in Support
Fri 10/15 2:41 PM
MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Culpepper Company of Fayetteville. (Hutchinson, Timothy) |
|
7 | 7
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Fri 10/15 2:38 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Culpepper Company of Fayetteville. (Hutchinson, Timothy) |
|
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney filed Complaint)
Fri 10/15 2:31 PM
ANSWER to2 Complaint by Culpepper Company of Fayetteville.(Hutchinson, Timothy) |
|
Friday, October 08, 2021 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Fri 10/08 9:57 AM
THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Culpepper Company of Fayetteville and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (tg) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Magistrate Notice/Consent Form
Fri 10/08 8:10 AM
Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (tg) |
|
Thursday, October 07, 2021 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Requested
Thu 10/07 6:04 PM
THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Culpepper Company of Fayetteville for service of the following document: 2 Complaint. (Burks, Christopher) |
|
2 | 2
cmp
Complaint
Thu 10/07 6:01 PM
COMPLAINT against Culpepper Company of Fayetteville ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AARWDC-2473141), filed by Jessica Phipps.(Burks, Christopher) |
|
1 | 1
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Thu 10/07 11:00 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Jessica Phipps. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s). If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day your case may be terminated . (tg) |