Childres v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Arkansas Western District Court | |
Judge: | Barry A Bryant |
Case #: | 6:21-cv-06132 |
Nature of Suit | 865 Social Security - RSI (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:0405g Review of HHS Decision (RSI) |
Case Filed: | Oct 07, 2021 |
Terminated: | Sep 22, 2022 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Monday, January 08, 2024 | ||
37 | 37
order
Judgment - Attorney Fees Order on Motion for Attorney Fees
Mon 01/08 3:45 PM
ORDER granting29 Motion for Attorney Fees in the amount of $23910.00. This amount represents 30 court-related hours at an hourly rate of approximately $797.00. Further, the Court also directs Plaintiffs counsel to refund to Plaintiff the amount of $6,511.42, which was awarded under the EAJA. Signed by Honorable Barry A Bryant on January 8, 2024. (jlm) |
|
Monday, December 18, 2023 | ||
36 | 36
respm
Response to Motion
Mon 12/18 3:39 PM
RESPONSE IN SUPPORT OF Motion re29 First MOTION for Attorney Fees Under 406(B) filed by Social Security Administration Commissioner.(Stewart, Sean) |
|
Att: 1 proposed order | ||
Friday, December 15, 2023 | ||
35 | 35
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Order on Motion for Attorney Fees
Fri 12/15 9:53 AM
TEXT ONLY ORDER granting34 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re34 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to29 First MOTION for Attorney Fees Under 406(B) MOTION for Attorney Fees to January 5, 2024; terminating motion34 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Honorable Barry A Bryant on December 15, 2023. (lmg) |
|
Thursday, December 14, 2023 | ||
34 | 34
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Attorney Fees
Thu 12/14 2:53 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to29 First MOTION for Attorney Fees Under 406(B) , MOTION for Attorney Fees by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Stewart, Sean) |
|
33 | 33
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 12/14 12:53 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Sean Stewart on behalf of Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Stewart, Sean) |
|
Tuesday, November 28, 2023 | ||
32 | 32
order
Order
Tue 11/28 7:15 PM
TEXT ONLY ORDER The SSA is directed to file a response to Plaintiff's First Motion for Attorney's Fees (ECF No. 29) by December 15, 2023. Signed by Honorable Barry A Bryant on November 28, 2023. (lmg) |
|
Friday, November 17, 2023 | ||
utility
Memo of Reassignment
Fri 11/17 4:20 PM
TEXT ONLY MEMO OF REASSIGNMENT. Case reassigned to Honorable Barry A Bryant. Honorable Susan O. Hickey no longer assigned to the case. Consent filed 11/29/2022. (mjm) |
||
Thursday, November 16, 2023 | ||
31 | 31
order
Order Referring Motion
Thu 11/16 11:58 AM
TEXT ONLY ORDER REFERRING29 First MOTION for Attorney Fees Under 406(B) filed by Tambra Dee Childres to Honorable Barry A. Bryant, U.S. Magistrate Judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and Local Rule 72.1. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on November 16, 2023. Motions referred to Barry A Bryant.(rwg) |
|
Wednesday, October 11, 2023 | ||
30 | 30
msupport
Memorandum Brief in Support
Wed 10/11 2:45 PM
MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of29 First MOTION for Attorney Fees Under 406(B) by Tambra Dee Childres. (Coleman, Nicholas) |
|
29 | 29
motion
Attorney Fees
Wed 10/11 2:25 PM
First MOTION for Attorney Fees Under 406(B) by Tambra Dee Childres.(Coleman, Nicholas) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit Declaration and Schedule of Hours, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Fee Agreement, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Notice of Award, | ||
Att: 4 Affidavit Childres Declaration | ||
Monday, December 12, 2022 | ||
28 | 28
order
Judgment - Attorney Fees Order on Motion for Attorney Fees
Mon 12/12 3:44 PM
ORDER granting25 Motion for Attorney Fees in the amount of $6938.34. Signed by Honorable Barry A Bryant on December 12, 2022. (jlm) |
|
utility
Case No Longer Referred
Mon 12/12 3:44 PM
Case no longer referred to Honorable Barry A Bryant. (jlm) |
||
Tuesday, November 29, 2022 | ||
27 | 27
notice
Notice of Consent/Reassignment - SSA
Tue 11/29 10:05 AM
CONSENT TO ASSIGNMENT to U.S. Magistrate Judge by Tambra Dee Childres. Government consent acknowledged pursuant to Standing Consent Letter. (Coleman, Nicholas) |
|
Wednesday, November 09, 2022 | ||
utility
Case Referred to Magistrate Judge
Wed 11/09 2:49 PM
CASE REFERRED to Honorable Barry A Bryant. Motions referred to Honorable Barry A Bryant.(hnc) |
||
Tuesday, November 08, 2022 | ||
26 | 26
msupport
Memorandum Brief in Support
Tue 11/08 4:16 PM
MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of25 First MOTION for Attorney Fees by Tambra Dee Childres. (Coleman, Nicholas) |
|
25 | 25
motion
Attorney Fees
Tue 11/08 4:15 PM
First MOTION for Attorney Fees by Tambra Dee Childres.(Coleman, Nicholas) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit Net Worth, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit CPI-South Urban Index, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit EAJA Itemization | ||
Thursday, September 22, 2022 | ||
24 | 24
1
pgs
order
Order Adopting Report and Recommendations
Thu 09/22 1:10 PM
Judgment ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS23 Report and Recommendations, reverses the decision of the Commissioner, and remands this case to the Commissioner for further consideration pursuant to sentence four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g) (2006). Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on September 22, 2022. (jlm) |
|
Tuesday, August 30, 2022 | ||
23 | 23
motion
Report and Recommendations
Tue 08/30 11:52 AM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re2 Complaint filed by Tambra Dee Childres. Objections to R&R due by 9/13/2022. Signed by Honorable Barry A Bryant on August 30, 2022. (jlm) |
|
Thursday, July 21, 2022 | ||
22 | 22
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 07/21 5:04 PM
NOTICE by Tambra Dee Childres re20 Appeal Brief (Social Security-Plaintiff) Notice of Supplemental Authority(Coleman, Nicholas) |
|
Att: 1 Supplement Beckham v. Social Security Administration, 2022 Wl 2813752 (W.D. Ark. July 1, 2022) | ||
Friday, June 10, 2022 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Appeal Brief (Social Security-Govt)
Fri 06/10 9:38 AM
APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Social Security Administration Commissioner. |
|
Monday, May 16, 2022 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Appeal Brief (Social Security-Plaintiff)
Mon 05/16 6:04 PM
APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Tambra Dee Childres.(Coleman, Nicholas) |
|
Att: 1 Supplement Medical Abstract Summary, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 215.137-014 Payroll Clerk | ||
Monday, April 18, 2022 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File ~Util - Set Deadlines
Mon 04/18 8:55 AM
TEXT ONLY ORDER granting18 Motion for Extension of Time to File. This Motion is unopposed. Plaintiff's SSA Appeal Brief is due by 5/16/2022. Signed by Honorable Barry A Bryant on April 18, 2022. (lmg) |
||
Friday, April 15, 2022 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Fri 04/15 12:09 PM
Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Brief by Tambra Dee Childres. Motions referred to Barry A Bryant.(Coleman, Nicholas) |
|
Wednesday, March 16, 2022 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Wed 03/16 1:42 PM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File by Tambra Dee Childres. Motions referred to Barry A Bryant.(Coleman, Nicholas) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File ~Util - Set Deadlines
Wed 03/16 2:58 PM
TEXT ONLY ORDER granting16 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Plaintiff's SSA Appeal Brief is due by 4/15/2022. Signed by Honorable Barry A Bryant on March 16, 2022. (lmg) |
||
Monday, February 14, 2022 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File ~Util - Set Deadlines
Mon 02/14 9:07 AM
TEXT ONLY ORDER granting14 Motion for Extension of Time to File. This Motion is unopposed. Plaintiff's SSA Appeal Brief is due by 3/16/2022. Signed by Honorable Barry A Bryant on February 14, 2022. (lmg) |
||
Friday, February 11, 2022 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Fri 02/11 1:57 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Brief by Tambra Dee Childres. Motions referred to Barry A Bryant.(Coleman, Nicholas) |
|
Friday, January 14, 2022 | ||
order
Social Security Scheduling Order
Fri 01/14 8:13 AM
TEXT ONLY SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER. Plaintiff must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date of the filing of the transcript. The brief must identify specific points for appeal. Plaintiff's failure to file a timely brief may result in dismissal for failure to prosecute. Defendant must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date Plaintiff's brief is served. Defendant's brief must respond to the issues raised in Plaintiff's brief and may include additional relevant issues. The brief should be no longer than twenty (20) pages in length. Any brief exceeding the page limitation imposed herein may be stricken from the record. Plaintiff's SSA Appeal Brief due is by 2/14/2022. Signed by Honorable Barry A Bryant on January 14, 2022. (lmg) |
||
Thursday, January 13, 2022 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Social Security Transcript
Thu 01/13 3:20 PM
SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Taylor, Candace) |
|
Tuesday, January 11, 2022 | ||
11 | 11
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney filed Complaint)
Tue 01/11 3:00 PM
ANSWER to2 Complaint by Social Security Administration Commissioner |
|
Monday, December 13, 2021 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Mon 12/13 1:26 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and certif admin record by Social Security Administration Commissioner. Motions referred to Barry A Bryant |
|
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer ~Util - Set Deadlines
Mon 12/13 4:27 PM
TEXT ONLY ORDER granting9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. This Motion is unopposed. Social Security Administration Commissioner's answer is due on 1/12/2022. Signed by Honorable Barry A Bryant on December 13, 2021. (lmg) |
||
Friday, October 22, 2021 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
Fri 10/22 10:20 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tambra Dee Childres. Social Security Administration Commissioner served on 10/14/2021, answer due 12/13/2021. (Coleman, Nicholas) |
|
Tuesday, October 12, 2021 | ||
7 | 7
service
Affidavit of Service as to USA
Tue 10/12 3:48 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, filed by Tambra Dee Childres. (Coleman, Nicholas) |
|
misc
Clerk's Order of Judge Assignment
Tue 10/12 8:15 AM
TEXT ONLY CLERK'S ORDER OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT to a District Judge. Case reassigned to presiding judge Honorable Susan O. Hickey and Honorable Barry A. Bryant, as the referral judge. (mjm) |
||
Friday, October 08, 2021 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Consent/Reassignment - SSA
Fri 10/08 1:01 PM
REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT to a District Judge for entry of the final judgment or order by Tambra Dee Childres. (Coleman, Nicholas) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Fri 10/08 12:57 PM
THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (jlm) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Magistrate Notice - SSA
Fri 10/08 12:50 PM
NOTICE OF DIRECT ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE. This case has been assigned to a U.S. Magistrate Judge to conduct all proceedings and for entry of a final judgment. You must file the attached form memorializing consent or requesting reassignment to a District Judge within fourteen (14) days. Consent or Reassignment form due by 10/22/2021.(jlm) |
|
Att: 1 Consent/Reassignment Form | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Requested as to USA
Fri 10/08 12:42 PM
THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested for USA Agency, Corporation, Officers or Employees as to USDA - Western District of Arkansas; Office of General Counsel, Region VI; Attorney General of USA for service of the following document: 2 Complaint. (Coleman, Nicholas) |
|
2 | 2
cmp
Complaint
Fri 10/08 12:37 PM
COMPLAINT Tabra Childres against Social Security Administration Commissioner ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AARWDC-2473608), filed by Tambra Dee Childres.(Coleman, Nicholas) |
|
Thursday, October 07, 2021 | ||
1 | 1
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Thu 10/07 10:14 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Tambra Dee Childres. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s). If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day your case may be terminated . (lw) |