Harris v. 3M Company, The et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:21-cv-03271 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Oct 07, 2021 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 05, 2022 4:22 AM EDT |
Defendant
Chubb Fire LTD
|
|
Defendant
United Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
|
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
|
|
Defendant
Kidde PLC Inc
|
|
Defendant
Honeywell International Inc
|
|
Defendant
EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
103 Fairview Park Drive
Elmsford, NY 10523 |
|
Defendant
Du Pont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
Coporation Trust Company 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company, The
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company FC LLC, The
|
|
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Co.
|
|
Defendant
BASF Corp
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
|
Defendant
Archroma Management LLC
Archroma Management LLC 4000 Monroe Rd.
Charlotte, NC 28205 |
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
|
|
Defendant
3M Company, The
|
|
Plaintiff
Robert Harris
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, August 06, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 08/06 1:16 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by PlaintiffsAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Primeau, Robin) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Thursday, October 07, 2021 | ||
3 | 3
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Thu 10/07 3:58 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-filed), Harris v. 3M et al, as DSC case 2:21-cv-3271-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Eastern Virginia (entry removed in error, clerk re-entered) (sshe, ) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Thu 10/07 3:57 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (entry removed in error, clerk re-entered) (sshe, ) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 10/07 3:57 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0420-10114725.), filed by Robert Harris. Service due by 1/5/2022 (entry removed in error, clerk re-entered)(sshe, ) |