Northcutt et al v. Berhe et al
Arkansas Western District Court | |
Judge: | Timothy L Brooks |
Case #: | 5:21-cv-05178 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal |
Case Filed: | Oct 07, 2021 |
Terminated: | Mar 03, 2022 |
Case in other court: | Circuit Court of Benton County, 04CV-21-02044 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 05, 2022 3:46 AM CDT |
Defendant
Yosef T. Berhe
yosef.berhe@gmail.com 400 Park Avenue Apartment 319
Beechwood, OH 44122 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Weichert Workforce Mobility Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Biserat Zegai
biserat.zegai@hotmail.com 400 Park Avenue Apartment 319
Beechwood, OH 44122 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Curtis Northcutt
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Natalie Northcutt
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, March 03, 2022 | ||
26 | 26
1
pgs
order
Order of Dismissal
Thu 03/03 11:57 AM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL, case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE subject to the terms of the settlement agreement. (See Order for Specifics) Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on March 3, 2022. (lgd) |
|
Friday, January 28, 2022 | ||
order
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
Fri 01/28 7:55 AM
***CASE MANAGEMENT HEARING set for 2/2/22 TERMINATED at the request of counsel. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on January 28, 2022. (slc) |
||
Monday, January 24, 2022 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Mon 01/24 10:25 AM
TEXT ONLY ORDER granting24 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. The new deadline is January 27, 2022. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on January 24, 2022. (ee) |
||
Friday, January 21, 2022 | ||
24 | 24
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Fri 01/21 5:08 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to22 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Curtis Northcutt, Natalie Northcutt. (Lewis, Todd) |
|
Monday, January 10, 2022 | ||
23 | 23
28
pgs
msupport
Memorandum Brief in Support
Mon 01/10 3:25 PM
MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of22 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Weichert Workforce Mobility Inc.. (Hopkins, Adam) |
|
22 | 22
motion
Judgment on the Pleadings
Mon 01/10 3:24 PM
MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Weichert Workforce Mobility Inc.. (Hopkins, Adam) |
|
Thursday, January 06, 2022 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 01/06 2:12 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Smith on behalf of Weichert Workforce Mobility Inc.. (Smith, Ryan) |
|
Wednesday, December 29, 2021 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
Wed 12/29 3:56 PM
JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Curtis Northcutt, Natalie Northcutt. (Lewis, Todd) |
|
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 12/29 9:42 AM
TEXT ONLY ORDER GRANTING18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. VOLNEY BRAND appearing for Separate Defendants Yosef Berhe and Biserat Zegai. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on December 29, 2021. (slc) |
||
Friday, December 24, 2021 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 12/24 9:00 AM
First MOTION for Attorney Volney Brand to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Yosef Berhe and Biserat Zegai (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-2515512) by Yosef T. Berhe. (Brand, Volney) |
|
Monday, December 20, 2021 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement - Filed by Attorney
Mon 12/20 11:06 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Weichert Workforce Mobility Inc.. (Hopkins, Adam) |
|
Thursday, December 02, 2021 | ||
16 | 16
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 12/02 2:25 PM
Defendants Berhe and Zegai's ANSWER to4 Complaint by Yosef T. Berhe, Biserat Zegai.(lgd) |
|
Monday, November 22, 2021 | ||
15 | 15
service
Affidavit of Service
Mon 11/22 1:51 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint, filed by All Plaintiffs. Yosef T. Berhe served on 11/10/2021, answer due 12/1/2021; Biserat Zegai served on 11/10/2021, answer due 12/1/2021. (Lewis, Todd) |
|
Wednesday, November 17, 2021 | ||
14 | 14
order
Initial Scheduling Order
Wed 11/17 10:05 AM
INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Hearing set for 2/2/2022 01:30 PM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable Timothy L. Brooks. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/29/2021. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on November 17, 2021. (slc) |
|
Friday, November 12, 2021 | ||
13 | 13
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 11/12 3:31 PM
ANSWER to4 Complaint by Weichert Workforce Mobility Inc..(Hopkins, Adam) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Weichert No Representation Disclosure Statement | ||
Friday, November 05, 2021 | ||
12 | 12
service
Summons Issued
Fri 11/05 8:18 AM
THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Yosef T. Berhe, Biserat Zegai and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (lgd) |
|
Thursday, November 04, 2021 | ||
11 | 11
service
Summons Requested
Thu 11/04 4:45 PM
THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Biserat Zegai for service of the following document: 4 Complaint. (Lewis, Todd) |
|
10 | 10
service
Summons Requested
Thu 11/04 4:44 PM
THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Yosef T. Berhe for service of the following document: 4 Complaint. (Lewis, Todd) |
|
notice
Notice of Deficiency
Thu 11/04 2:45 PM
TEXT ONLY NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY directed to Curtis Northcutt, Natalie Northcutt: A8 Summons Returned Executed,9 Summons Returned Executed was filed with the Court and appears to contain one or more deficiencies. The document appears to be deficient as follows: State Summons form (with state answer deadlines) served upon defendants after case was removed from state court to U.S. District Court. You are advised that the filing, while on the record, will not be considered unless and until all deficiencies are remedied. (src) |
||
Monday, October 25, 2021 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 10/25 10:40 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Biserat Zegai served on 10/9/2021, answer due 11/1/2021. (Lewis, Todd) |
|
8 | 8
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 10/25 10:38 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Yosef T. Berhe served on 10/9/2021, answer due 11/1/2021. (Lewis, Todd) |
|
Thursday, October 21, 2021 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Jury Demand
Thu 10/21 4:34 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Curtis Northcutt, Natalie Northcutt. (Lewis, Todd) |
|
Thursday, October 14, 2021 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Thu 10/14 2:25 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re4 Complaint by Weichert Workforce Mobility Inc.. (Hopkins, Adam) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Thu 10/14 2:39 PM
TEXT ONLY ORDER granting5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Weichert Workforce Mobility Inc.'s Answer is now due no later than 11/12/2021. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on October 14, 2021. (jld) |
||
Thursday, October 07, 2021 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Complaint
Thu 10/07 3:01 PM
STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Yosef T. Berhe, Weichert Workforce Mobility Inc., Biserat Zegai, filed by Curtis Northcutt, Natalie Northcutt.(tg) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Magistrate Notice/Consent Form
Thu 10/07 3:00 PM
Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (tg) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Thu 10/07 2:40 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Weichert Workforce Mobility Inc. (tg) |
|
1 | 1
6
pgs
cmp
Notice of Removal
Thu 10/07 2:35 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Benton County, case number 04CV 21-2044 filed by Weichert Workforce Mobility Inc.(tg) (tg) |
|
Att: 1 72 pgs (10/7/2021) Exhibit A State Court Complaint | ||
notice
Clerk's Notice Regarding Filing Fee
Thu 10/07 3:02 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee:1 Notice of Removal. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 402.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days. If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal. Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 10/12/2021 (tg) |
||
notice
Clerk's Order re: Demand for Jury Trial
Thu 10/07 3:03 PM
TEXT ONLY CLERK'S ORDER requiring parties to request a trial by jury within 14 days from date of this order, if desired and allowed by law. (tg) |
||
misc
Filing Fee Submitted
Thu 10/07 3:40 PM
Notice of Removal filing fee paid re1 Notice of Removal : $ 402, receipt number AARWDC-2472886.. (Hopkins, Adam) |