Guerra v. Community Loan
Original Case: 7:21-cv-00132
Fifth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:21-pcd-40747 |
Type | private civil diversity / private |
Nature of Suit | 220 Real Property - Foreclosure |
Case Filed: | Oct 07, 2021 |
Terminated: | Mar 17, 2022 |
Last checked: Friday Mar 18, 2022 3:27 AM CDT |
Defendant - Appellee
Community Loan Servicing, L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Movant - Appellant
Juan Angel Guerra
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/18/2022 3:27 AM CDT |
Thursday, October 07, 2021 | ||
4 pgs PRIVATE CIVIL DIVERSITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Juan Angel Guerra 21-40747 (CCR) |