BCG Masonic Cleveland, LLC et al v. Myeress
Arkansas Western District Court | |
Judge: | Timothy L Brooks |
Case #: | 5:21-cv-05179 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:501 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Oct 08, 2021 |
Terminated: | Nov 23, 2021 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 06, 2022 3:21 AM CDT |
Defendant
Joe Myeress
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
BCG Masonic Cleveland, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Beaty Capital Group, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Tuesday, November 23, 2021 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Clerk's Order Dismissing Case/Party
Tue 11/23 12:14 PM
CLERK'S ORDER Dismissing Case: re17 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Case filed by BCG Masonic Cleveland, LLC, Beaty Capital Group, Inc. (CASE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE). (tg) |
|
Monday, November 22, 2021 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (Party/Case)
Mon 11/22 2:33 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case by BCG Masonic Cleveland, LLC, Beaty Capital Group, Inc. with prejudice . (Scott, John) |
|
Tuesday, November 02, 2021 | ||
16 | 16
service
Affidavit of Service
Tue 11/02 2:20 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint, filed by BCG Masonic Cleveland, LLC, Beaty Capital Group, Inc.. Joe Myeress served on 10/27/2021, answer due 11/17/2021. (Scott, John) |
|
Wednesday, October 27, 2021 | ||
15 | 15
6
pgs
msupport
Memorandum Brief in Support
Wed 10/27 4:07 PM
MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of14 MOTION to Enjoin Defendant from Pursuing Parallel Proceeding by BCG Masonic Cleveland, LLC, Beaty Capital Group, Inc.. (Scott, John) |
|
14 | 14
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 10/27 4:05 PM
MOTION to Enjoin Defendant from Pursuing Parallel Proceeding by BCG Masonic Cleveland, LLC, Beaty Capital Group, Inc.. (Scott, John) |
|
13 | 13
respm
Response to Motion
Wed 10/27 3:39 PM
RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re7 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by BCG Masonic Cleveland, LLC, Beaty Capital Group, Inc..(Scott, John) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Lance Beaty, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - PACER records, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Article | ||
Friday, October 22, 2021 | ||
12 | 12
order
Initial Scheduling Order
Fri 10/22 9:12 AM
INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Hearing set for 1/5/2022 01:30 PM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable Timothy L. Brooks. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/2/2021. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on October 22, 2021. (slc) |
|
Monday, October 18, 2021 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Initial Report re Copyright/Patent/Trademark
Mon 10/18 10:25 AM
INITIAL REPORT ON THE FILING OF A COPYRIGHT ACTION for a case initiated by BCG Masonic Cleveland, LLC, Beaty Capital Group, Inc. with the filing of2 Complaint,. (Scott, John) |
|
Thursday, October 14, 2021 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement - Filed by Attorney
Thu 10/14 10:07 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by BCG Masonic Cleveland, LLC, Beaty Capital Group, Inc.. (Scott, John) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Pretrial Disclosure Sheet
Thu 10/14 9:40 AM
***PLEASE DISREGARD****PRETRIAL DISCLOSURE SHEET by BCG Masonic Cleveland, LLC, Beaty Capital Group, Inc.. (Scott, John) Modified text on 10/14/2021 (lgd) |
|
Wednesday, October 13, 2021 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 10/13 1:01 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Ethan Spenser Ellis on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Ellis, Ethan) |
|
7 | 7
motion
Dismiss Case
Wed 10/13 11:00 AM
MOTION to Dismiss Case by Joe Myeress.(DeSouza, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Email, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Email and Letter, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Email | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 10/13 10:17 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Todd P. Lewis on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Lewis, Todd) |
|
Tuesday, October 12, 2021 | ||
notice
Clerk's Notice re Multiple Attorneys Listed on Pleading
Tue 10/12 9:29 AM
TEXT ONLY CLERK'S NOTICE re Multiple Attorneys Listed on Pleading directed to Plaintiffs BCG Masonic Cleveland, LLC, Beaty Capital Group, Inc. Complaint,2 lists multiple attorneys appearing for the filer. The following attorney(s), who did not sign the pleading, must enter a separate Notice of Appearance in order to receive electronic notification of future activity in the case: Todd P. Lewis, Ethan Ellis . (lgd) |
||
notice
Clerk's Notice re Copyright/Patent/Trademark Actions
Tue 10/12 9:32 AM
TEXT ONLY CLERK'S NOTICE to attorney(s) filing a complaint or amended complaint in a Copyright action: Please complete AO Form 121 found on the U.S Courts website https://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms and file it with the Court using Other Filings-Other Documents-Initial Report.Copyright/Patent/Trademark Report due 11/2/2021. (lgd) |
||
Friday, October 08, 2021 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Fri 10/08 11:50 AM
THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Joe Myeress and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (src) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Requested
Fri 10/08 11:43 AM
THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Joe Myeress for service of the following document: 2 Complaint,. (Scott, John) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Magistrate Notice/Consent Form
Fri 10/08 11:42 AM
Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (tg) |
|
2 | 2
5
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Fri 10/08 11:40 AM
COMPLAINT against Joe Myeress ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AARWDC-2473526), filed by BCG Masonic Cleveland, LLC, Beaty Capital Group, Inc..(Scott, John) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Demand Letter, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2(a) - Facebook Post, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2(b) - Instagram Post | ||
1 | 1
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Fri 10/08 11:15 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by BCG Masonic Cleveland, LLC, Beaty Capital Group, Inc. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s). If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day your case may be terminated . (tg) |