City of Sioux Falls v. Archroma U.S., Inc.
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:21-cv-03281 |
Nature of Suit | 245 Real Property - Tort Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Oct 08, 2021 |
Case in other court: | North Carolina Western, 3:21-cv-00226 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 06, 2022 5:07 AM EDT |
Defendant
Archroma U.S. Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
City of Sioux Falls
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, October 08, 2021 | ||
11 | 11
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Fri 10/08 4:05 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: North Carolina Western, 3:21-cv-00226, City of Sioux Falls v. Archroma U.S., Inc., as DSC case 2:21-cv-3281-RMG (sshe, ) |
|
9 | 9
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Fri 10/08 4:02 PM
Case transferred in from District of North Carolina Western; Case Number 3:21-cv-00226. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
8 | 8
transfer
Case Transferred Out - District per MDL
Fri 10/08 11:40 AM
Transfer Order of Judicial Panel MDL transferring case to District of South Carolina, MDL# 2873 (CTO-67). Matter transferred for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Signed by Clerk of the Panel, John W. Nichols. (tms) |
|
Case electronically transferred to District of South Carolina. Original electronic file and docket sheet sent. (tms) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 10/8/2021.] | ||
transfer
Case Transferred Out - District Not MDL
Fri 10/08 11:43 AM
Case electronically transferred to District of South Carolina. Original electronic file and docket sheet sent. (tms) |
||
Monday, October 04, 2021 | ||
7 | 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer by Archroma U.S., Inc.. (Weber, Steven) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 10/8/2021.] | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order Consent Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time | ||
TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting 7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The defendant shall have up to and including October 24, 2021 to serve an answer or otherwise respond. Entered by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 10/4/2021.(LB) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 10/8/2021.] | ||
Tuesday, September 14, 2021 | ||
TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting 5 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 1 Complaint . Defendant will have additional time to answer, up to and including 10/4/2021. Entered by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 9/14/2021.(LB) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 10/8/2021.] | ||
Monday, September 13, 2021 | ||
6 | 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Archroma U.S., Inc. (Weber, Steven) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 10/8/2021.] | |
5 | 5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or File Other Responsive Pleading by Archroma U.S., Inc.. (Weber, Steven) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 10/8/2021.] | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
4 | 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Daniel Weber on behalf of Archroma U.S., Inc. (Weber, Steven) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 10/8/2021.] | |
Monday, May 17, 2021 | ||
3 | 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to Archroma U.S., Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (js) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 10/8/2021.] | |
2 | 2 Miscellaneous Filing by City of Sioux Falls. Summons as to Archroma U.S., Inc. (Seagle, J.) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 10/8/2021.] | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against Archroma U.S., Inc. with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0419-5033933), filed by City of Sioux Falls.(Seagle, J.) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 10/8/2021.] | |
Att: 1 Cover Sheet | ||
Case assigned to Senior Judge Graham Mullen. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the[LINK:Case Assignment Packet] . This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (js) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 10/8/2021.] |