Manning v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Arkansas Western District Court | |
Judge: | Barry A Bryant |
Case #: | 1:21-cv-01048 |
Nature of Suit | 865 Social Security - RSI (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:405g Review of HHS Decision (RSI) |
Case Filed: | Oct 08, 2021 |
Terminated: | May 06, 2022 |
Defendant
Social Security Administration Commissioner
|
|
Plaintiff
Eric Lamont Manning
|
Docket last updated: 72 minutes ago |
Thursday, July 28, 2022 | ||
24 | 24
order
Judgment - Attorney Fees Order on Motion for Attorney Fees
Thu 07/28 2:02 PM
ORDER granting22 Motion for Attorney Fees, in the amount of $5342.84 (EAJA Attorney Fees). Signed by Honorable Barry A Bryant on July 28, 2022. (cnn) |
|
Friday, July 08, 2022 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Stipulation
Fri 07/08 3:08 PM
STIPULATION re22 MOTION for Attorney Fees Under the EAJA for EAJA fees by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Tucker, Eric) |
|
Wednesday, July 06, 2022 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Attorney Fees
Wed 07/06 4:26 PM
MOTION for Attorney Fees Under the EAJA by Eric Lamont Manning.(Long, Martin) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Itemization of EAJA Attorney Hours, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2021 CPI-U South | ||
Friday, May 06, 2022 | ||
21 | 21
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Remand Judgment - SSA
Fri 05/06 3:33 PM
ORDER granting18 Motion to Remand; JUDGMENT REVERSING THE DECISION OF THE COMMISSIONER AND REMANDING THIS CASE TO THE COMMISSIONER FOR FURTHER CONSIDERATION PURSUANT TO SENTENCE FOUR of 42 U.S.C. 405(g) as set forth in the20 Memorandum Opinion. Signed by Honorable Barry A Bryant on May 6, 2022.(mll) |
|
20 | 20
1
pgs
order
Memorandum Opinion
Fri 05/06 3:28 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Honorable Barry A Bryant on May 6, 2022.(mll) |
|
Monday, May 02, 2022 | ||
19 | 19
msupport
Memorandum Brief in Support
Mon 05/02 1:39 PM
MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of18 MOTION to Remand pursuant to sentence four by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Tucker, Eric) |
|
18 | 18
motion
Remand
Mon 05/02 1:38 PM
MOTION to Remand pursuant to sentence four by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Tucker, Eric) |
|
Thursday, March 31, 2022 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Appeal Brief (Social Security-Plaintiff)
Thu 03/31 9:08 AM
APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Eric Lamont Manning. (Long, Martin) |
|
Sunday, March 06, 2022 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Appearance
Sun 03/06 9:07 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Martin Long on behalf of Eric Lamont Manning. (Long, Martin) |
|
Wednesday, March 02, 2022 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Extend ~Util - Set Deadlines
Wed 03/02 6:55 AM
TEXT ONLY ORDER granting14 Motion to Extend. Plaintiff's SSA Appeal Brief is due by 4/4/2022. Signed by Honorable Barry A Bryant on March 2, 2022. (lmg) |
||
Tuesday, March 01, 2022 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Extend
Tue 03/01 3:52 PM
First MOTION to Extend Time to File Plaintiff's Brief by Eric Lamont Manning. (Webb, Daniel) |
|
Monday, January 31, 2022 | ||
order
Social Security Scheduling Order
Mon 01/31 2:23 PM
TEXT ONLY SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER. Plaintiff must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date of the filing of the transcript. The brief must identify specific points for appeal. Plaintiff's failure to file a timely brief may result in dismissal for failure to prosecute. Defendant must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date Plaintiff's brief is served. Defendant's brief must respond to the issues raised in Plaintiff's brief and may include additional relevant issues. The brief should be no longer than twenty (20) pages in length. Any brief exceeding the page limitation imposed herein may be stricken from the record. Plaintiff's SSA Appeal Brief due by 3/2/2022. Signed by Honorable Barry A Bryant on January 31, 2022. (lmg) |
||
Friday, January 28, 2022 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Social Security Transcript
Fri 01/28 3:44 PM
SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Taylor, Candace) |
|
11 | 11
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney filed Complaint)
Fri 01/28 2:50 PM
ANSWER to2 Complaint by Social Security Administration Commissioner.(Tucker, Eric) |
|
Thursday, January 13, 2022 | ||
service
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
Thu 01/13 9:27 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eric Lamont Manning. Social Security Administration Commissioner served on 12/1/2021, answer due 1/31/2022. (see document9 ) (cnn) |
||
Wednesday, January 12, 2022 | ||
9 | 9
service
Affidavit of Service as to USA
Wed 01/12 4:49 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for COMPLAINT AND SUMMONS, filed by Eric Lamont Manning. All Defendants. (Webb, Daniel) |
|
Friday, November 12, 2021 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Fri 11/12 3:27 PM
THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (mll) |
|
Thursday, November 11, 2021 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Requested as to USA
Thu 11/11 11:44 AM
THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested for USA Agency, Corporation, Officers or Employees as to SSA Dallas, US AG, US Attorney for Western District Arkansas for service of the following document: 2 Complaint. (Webb, Daniel) |
|
Tuesday, November 09, 2021 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Consent/Reassignment - SSA
Tue 11/09 3:38 PM
CONSENT TO ASSIGNMENT to U.S. Magistrate Judge by Eric Lamont Manning. Government consent acknowledged pursuant to Standing Consent Letter. (Webb, Daniel) |
|
Thursday, November 04, 2021 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Magistrate Notice - SSA
Thu 11/04 3:38 PM
NOTICE OF DIRECT ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE. This case has been assigned to a U.S. Magistrate Judge to conduct all proceedings and for entry of a final judgment. You must file the attached form memorializing consent or requesting reassignment to a District Judge within fourteen (14) days. Consent or Reassignment form due by 11/18/2021.(cnn) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Consent Form | ||
Tuesday, October 12, 2021 | ||
4 | 4
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis Order on Motion for Service
Tue 10/12 10:13 AM
ORDER granting3 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis; granting3 Motion for Service and DIRECTING SERVICE on Social Security Administration Commissioner. The plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of the complaint and this order on the defendant by certified mail, return receipt requested, as well as the US Attorney General and US Attorney for Western District/Arkansas without prepayment of fees and costs. Defendant is to answer within 60 days from the date of service. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on October 12, 2021. (mll) |
|
Monday, October 11, 2021 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Appeal In Forma Pauperis
Mon 10/11 4:17 PM
First MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by Eric Lamont Manning. (Webb, Daniel) |
|
2 | 2
cmp
Complaint
Mon 10/11 4:16 PM
COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner, filed by Eric Lamont Manning.(Webb, Daniel) |
|
Friday, October 08, 2021 | ||
1 | 1
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Fri 10/08 4:34 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Eric Lamont Manning. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s). If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day your case may be terminated . (src) |