Washington Western District Court
Case #: 2:21-mj-00506
Case Filed:Sep 10, 2021
Terminated:Sep 23, 2021
Last checked: Sunday Oct 10, 2021 12:18 AM PDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Erika J. Evans
Us Attorney'S Office (tacoma)
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Steven Michael Canan (1)
Terminated: 09/23/2021
Represented By
Gilbert H. Levy
Gilbert H Levy
contact info
Defendant
Jason Paul Patrick (2)
Terminated: 09/23/2021
Represented By
Vanessa Pai-Thompson
Federal Public Defender'S Office (sea)
contact info


Docket last updated: 02/25/2022 8:16 PM PST
Friday, September 10, 2021
PC Arrest of Steven Michael Canan and Jason Paul Patrick on 9/10/2021. (JES)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Steven Michael Canan (1), Jason Paul Patrick (2). (JES)
Related: [-]
3 3 CJA 20 Appointment as to Steven Michael Canan (No.pdf image attached): Appointment of Attorney Gilbert H. Levy for Steven Michael Canan, Approved by Hon. S. Kate Vaughan. (JES)
Related: [-]
4 4 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. S. Kate Vaughan- CRD: J. Sands ; AUSA: Erika Evans ; Def Cnsl: Gil Levy ; PTS: Leona Nguyen ; Court Reporter: Digital Recording ; Time of Hearing: 2:00PM ; Courtroom: 12B ; INITIAL APPEARANCE as to Steven Michael Canan held on 9/10/2021. Defendant present in custody. Defendant advised of rights. Financial Affidavit reviewed. Counsel appointed. Agent sworn and signs complaint. Court signs complaint. Defendant advised of charges and penalties. Government moves for detention. Defendant stipulates to detention. Defendant ORDERED detained and remanded to custody. Defense requests Detention Hearing. Defendant remanded to custody. Detention Hearing set for 9/15/2021 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 12B before Hon. Paula L McCandlis. Preliminary Examination set for 9/24/2021 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 12B before Hon. Michelle L. Peterson. (JES) Modified on 9/14/2021 to correct minute entry. (JES)
Related: [-]
5 5 The Court Orders as follows: Pursuant to the Due Process Protection Act, counsel for the government is reminded of his/her obligations pursuant to Brady v. Maryland and its progeny to disclose exculpatory material and information, as required by applicable statute and case law. The failure to do so in a timely manner may result in dismissal of the indictment or information, dismissal of individual charges, exclusion of government evidence or witnesses, or any other remedy that is just under the circumstances. By Hon. S. Kate Vaughan. (No.pdf image attached) (JES)
Related: [-]
6 6 MOTION for Detention by USA as to Steven Michael Canan. (JES)
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER appointing Vanessa Pai-Thompson for Jason Paul Patrick. On the basis of the defendant's sworn financial statement, the court finds that he/she is financially unable to retain counsel. It is hereby ORDERED that the Federal Public Defender for the Western District of Washington be and hereby is appointed to represent the defendant pursuant to Title 18 United States Code 3006A. Approved by Hon. S. Kate Vaughan. (No.pdf image attached) (JES)
Related: [-]
9 9 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. S. Kate Vaughan- CRD: J. Sands ; AUSA: Erika Evans ; Def Cnsl: Vanessa Pai-Thompson ; PTS: Leona Nguyen ; Court Reporter: Digital Recording ; Time of Hearing: 2:00PM ; Courtroom: 12B ; INITIAL APPEARANCE AND DETENTION HEARING as to Jason Paul Patrick held on 9/10/2021. Defendant present in custody. Defendant advised of rights. Financial Affidavit reviewed. Counsel appointed. Agent sworn and signs complaint. Court signs complaint. Defendant advised of charges and penalties. Government moves for detention. Defendant stipulates to detention. Defendant ORDERED detained and remanded to custody. Preliminary Examination set for 9/24/2021 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 12B before Hon. Michelle L. Peterson. (JES)
Related: [-]
10 10 The Court Orders as follows: Pursuant to the Due Process Protection Act, counsel for the government is reminded of his/her obligations pursuant to Brady v. Maryland and its progeny to disclose exculpatory material and information, as required by applicable statute and case law. The failure to do so in a timely manner may result in dismissal of the indictment or information, dismissal of individual charges, exclusion of government evidence or witnesses, or any other remedy that is just under the circumstances. By Hon. S. Kate Vaughan. (No.pdf image attached) (JES)
Related: [-]
11 11 MOTION for Detention by USA as to Jason Paul Patrick. (JES)
Related: [-]
12 12 DETENTION ORDER as to Jason Paul Patrick re document11 MOTION for Detention by Hon. S. Kate Vaughan. (cc: PTS, USMO) (JES)
Related: [-]