USA v. Toebbe, et al
West Virginia Northern District Court | |
Case #: | 3:21-mj-00138 |
Case Filed: | Oct 08, 2021 |
Last checked: Monday Oct 11, 2021 3:16 AM EDT |
Defendant
Diana Toebbe (2)
|
|
Defendant
Jonathan Toebbe (1)
|
|
Plaintiff
USA
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12/09/2021 12:31 PM EST |
Friday, October 08, 2021 | ||
1 | 1 1 pgs CRIMINAL COMPLAINT as to Jonathan Toebbe (1) and Diana Toebbe (2). (Attachment: #1 Affidavit in Support of Criminal Complaint) (cwm) Copy to USA and USMS. | |
3 | 3 2 pgs ORDER TO SEAL ss to Jonathan Toebbe (1) and Diana Toebbe (2). Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 10/08/2021. (cwm) Copy to USA. |