Professional Inc v. Progressive Casualty Insurance
Original Case: 3:17-cv-00185
Third Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:21-cv-02874 |
Type | civil / private / diversity |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Case Filed: | Oct 08, 2021 |
Terminated: | Oct 12, 2022 |
Last checked: Thursday Oct 13, 2022 4:27 AM EDT |
Defendant - Appellee
PROGRESSIVE CASUALTY INSURANCE CO
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
PROFESSIONAL INC, DBA Professionals Auto Body
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Oct 12 2022
NOT PRECEDENTIAL OPINION. Coram: CHAGARES, Chief Judge, MCKEE and PORTER, Circuit Judges. Total Pages: 3. Judge: MCKEE Authoring. |
Docket last updated: 10/13/2022 4:27 AM EDT |
Friday, October 08, 2021 | ||
RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (SLC) | ||
CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Professional Inc in District Court No. 3-17-cv-00185. (SLC) | ||
Att: 1 22 pgs Notice of Appeal | ||
Att: 2 17 pgs Order | ||
Att: 3 1 pgs Judgment | ||
Att: 4 1 pgs Caption | ||
Att: 5 3 pgs Case Opening Letter |