Devillier v. State of Texas
Fifth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:21-pcf-40750 |
Type | private civil federal / private |
Nature of Suit | 240 Real Property - Torts to Land |
Case Filed: | Oct 08, 2021 |
Terminated: | Nov 23, 2022 |
Last checked: Thursday Nov 24, 2022 2:33 AM CST |
Defendant - Appellant
State of Texas
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Richard Devillier
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Wendy Devillier
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Steven Devillier
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Rhonda Devillier
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Barbara Devillier
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Nov 23 2022
PUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [21-40750 Vacated and Remanded ] Judge: PEH , Judge: LHS , Judge: SAH. Mandate issue date is 12/15/2022 [21-40750] |
Docket last updated: 11/24/2022 2:33 AM CST |
Friday, October 08, 2021 | ||
PARTY LIMIT CASE. (FOR A FULL LIST OF PARTIES FOR THIS APPEAL, PLEASE REFER TO THE DISTRICT COURT'S DOCKET SHEET.) 21-40750 (SDH) | ||
1 pgs PRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant State of Texas 21-40750 (SDH) | ||
PERMISSION TO APPEAL GRANTED. Case transferred from miscellaneous case number 21-90043 Fee due on 10/22/2021 for Appellant State of Texas. Transcript order due on 10/25/2021 for Appellant State of Texas 21-40750 (SDH) | ||
Att: 1 1 pgs Court Order | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs MOT-11 Letter | ||
Att: 3 4 pgs DKT-2 Letter |