Shaw v. Ciox Health
Original Case: 2:19-cv-14778
Fifth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:21-cr-30628 |
Type | civil rights / private |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Case Filed: | Oct 08, 2021 |
Terminated: | Nov 19, 2021 |
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 23, 2021 2:29 AM CST |
Defendant - Appellee
Ciox Health,L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Ciox Health, L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Jaquetta Shaw
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11/23/2021 2:29 AM CST |
Friday, October 08, 2021 | ||
3 pgs CIVIL RIGHTS CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Ms. Jaquetta Shaw 21-30628 (MAS) |