Arch v. Candelario
Original Case: 4:20-cv-00036
Fifth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:21-pcd-50955 |
Type | private civil diversity / private |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Case Filed: | Oct 08, 2021 |
Terminated: | Dec 22, 2021 |
Last checked: Thursday Dec 23, 2021 2:28 AM CST |
Defendant - Appellee
Rita Candelario
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Cristobal Candelario
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Arch Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12/23/2021 2:28 AM CST |
Friday, October 08, 2021 | ||
2 pgs PRIVATE CIVIL DIVERSITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Arch Insurance Company 21-50955 (LLL) |