Bragg, et al v. Big Heart Pet Brands, et al
Original Case: 2:21-cv-02047
Tenth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:21-cv-03186 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Oct 08, 2021 |
Terminated: | Oct 27, 2021 |
Last checked: Thursday Oct 28, 2021 2:28 AM MDT |
Defendant
ESIS, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
BIG HEART PET BRANDS, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA, domiciled in Pennsylvania
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
GALLAGHER BASSETT SERVICES, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
CLINTON G. BRAGG, JR., individually and on behalf of the heirs at law of decedent Clinton G. Bragg, III, and as co-administrator of the estate of Clinton G. Bragg, III, deceased
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
PATTI TUCK, individually and on behalf of the heirs at law of decedent, Clinton G. Bragg, III, and as co-administrator of the estate of Clinton G. Bragg, III, deceased
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Oct 27 2021
[10868056] Frap 42; Procedural termination without judicial action; Clerk of the Court. [21-3186] |
Docket last updated: 10/28/2021 2:28 AM MDT |
Friday, October 08, 2021 | ||
[10864075] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 10/08/2021 Docketing statement, transcript order form and notice of appearance due 10/22/2021 for Clinton G. Bragg Jr. and Patti Tuck. Notice of appearance also due on 10/22/2021 for Big Heart Pet Brands, Inc., Gallagher Bassett Services, Inc. and Indemnity Insurance Company of North America 21-3186 | ||
Att: 1 36 pgs Main Document | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs General Docket Letter - Counsel - Civil |