Ballard v. Hilcorp Energy
Original Case: 6:19-cv-01338
Fifth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:21-pcd-30632 |
Type | private civil diversity / private |
Nature of Suit | 340 Torts - Personal Injury - Marine |
Case Filed: | Oct 11, 2021 |
Terminated: | Jun 07, 2022 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jun 08, 2022 3:32 AM CDT |
Defendant - Appellant
Hilcorp Energy Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
Facilities Automation of Lafayette, L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Teddy Ballard
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Rachal Ballard
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Jun 07 2022
UNPUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [21-30632 Dismissed] Judge: PEH, Judge: SAH, Judge: ASO Mandate issue date is 06/29/2022 [21-30632] |
Docket last updated: 06/08/2022 3:32 AM CDT |
Monday, October 11, 2021 | ||
2 pgs PRIVATE CIVIL DIVERSITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Facilities Automation of Lafayette, L.L.C. and Hilcorp Energy Company 21-30632 (AGL) |