Duncan v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Arkansas Western District Court | |
Judge: | Mark E Ford |
Case #: | 2:21-cv-02168 |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID) |
Case Filed: | Oct 12, 2021 |
Terminated: | Oct 03, 2022 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Monday, October 03, 2022 | ||
22 | 22
order
Judgment - SSA
Mon 10/03 10:55 AM
FINAL JUDGMENT AFFIRMING THE DECISION OF THE COMMISSIONER and Plaintiffs case is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on October 3, 2022. (jlm) |
|
21 | 21
minutes
Social Security Hearing
Mon 10/03 10:43 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Mark E. Ford: Social Security Hearing held on 10/3/2022. (Debbie Maddox-Digital Recorder) (Proceedings held in Fort Smith-Room 226) (djm) |
|
Wednesday, September 28, 2022 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Waive
Wed 09/28 8:05 AM
MOTION to Waive ORAL ARGUMENT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Curtis, Kizuwanda) |
|
order
Order on Motion to Waive
Wed 09/28 8:24 AM
TEXT ONLY ORDER granting19 Motion to Waive Oral Argument. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on September 28, 2022. (cla) |
||
Wednesday, August 03, 2022 | ||
order
Order Setting Social Security Hearing
Wed 08/03 1:52 PM
TEXT ONLY INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Counsel for government will be permitted to appear by telephone conference. Social Security Hearing set for 10/3/2022 10:00 AM in Fort Smith -- 2nd flr (Rm 226) before Honorable Mark E. Ford. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on August 3, 2022. (djm) |
||
Friday, February 04, 2022 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Appeal Brief (Social Security-Govt)
Fri 02/04 4:56 PM
APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Curtis, Kizuwanda) |
|
Friday, January 07, 2022 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Supplement
Fri 01/07 12:18 AM
SUPPLEMENT by Plaintiff Tina J. Duncan to15 Appeal Brief (Social Security-Plaintiff) . (McKinnon, Laura) |
|
15 | 15
misc
Appeal Brief (Social Security-Plaintiff)
Fri 01/07 12:16 AM
APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Tina J. Duncan.(McKinnon, Laura) |
|
Att: 1 Supplement MER Abstract | ||
Monday, December 06, 2021 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Social Security Transcript
Mon 12/06 12:54 PM
SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner.(Taylor, Candace) |
|
Att: 1 Supplement Part 2 of 2 | ||
order
Social Security Scheduling Order - Oral Argument
Mon 12/06 2:50 PM
TEXT ONLY SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER. Plaintiff must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date of the filing of the transcript. The brief must identify the specific points for appeal, provide references to the medical evidence supporting each point, and include page numbers for all medical evidence referenced in the brief. Plaintiff's failure to file a timely brief may result in dismissal for failure to prosecute. Defendant must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date Plaintiff's brief is served. Defendant's brief must respond to the issues raised in Plaintiff's brief and may include additional relevant issues. All briefs are limited to twenty (20) pages in length. Any brief exceeding the page limitation imposed herein may be stricken from the record. All Social Security Appeal cases will be scheduled for oral argument once the briefs have been filed. A scheduling notice will be issued and the case placed on the calendar for oral argument as soon as can reasonably be permitted under Court policies, but not earlier than sixty (60) days following the filing of the appeal brief by the Social Security Commissioner. The scheduling order will indicate the date, time, and location of the oral argument. Any requests for continuance of the oral argument must be made by a formal motion. Video conferencing will be considered, if requested by formal motion, on a case by case basis, unless otherwise directed in the scheduling order. Plaintiffs SSA Appeal Brief due by 1/6/2022. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on December 6, 2021. (cla) |
||
order
Order Directing SSA Transcript Information - TEXT ONLY
Mon 12/06 2:51 PM
TEXT ONLY ORDER directing the parties to identify the transcript page numbers of any duplicative and/or irrelevant medical records in their Social Security appeal briefs. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on December 6, 2021. (cla) |
||
Wednesday, December 01, 2021 | ||
11 | 11
service
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
Wed 12/01 8:30 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tina J. Duncan. Social Security Administration Commissioner served on 10/28/2021, answer due 12/27/2021. (McKinnon, Laura) |
|
Tuesday, November 23, 2021 | ||
10 | 10
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney filed Complaint)
Tue 11/23 12:59 PM
ANSWER to2 Complaint by Social Security Administration Commissioner.(Curtis, Kizuwanda) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 11/23 12:40 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kizuwanda Curtis on behalf of Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Curtis, Kizuwanda) |
|
Monday, October 18, 2021 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Consent/Reassignment - SSA
Mon 10/18 12:50 PM
CONSENT TO ASSIGNMENT to U.S. Magistrate Judge by Tina J. Duncan. Government consent acknowledged pursuant to Standing Consent Letter. (McKinnon, Laura) |
|
Wednesday, October 13, 2021 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Wed 10/13 9:06 AM
THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (jlm) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Magistrate Notice - SSA
Wed 10/13 8:09 AM
NOTICE OF DIRECT ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE. This case has been assigned to a U.S. Magistrate Judge to conduct all proceedings and for entry of a final judgment. You must file the attached form memorializing consent or requesting reassignment to a District Judge within fourteen (14) days. Consent or Reassignment form due by 10/27/2021.(lw) |
|
Att: 1 Consent Reassignment Form | ||
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Order on Motion for Service
Wed 10/13 8:56 AM
TEXT ONLY ORDER granting3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis as after review it is found that Plaintiff is unable to pay for the costs of commencement of this suit ; granting3 Motion for Service and DIRECTING SERVICE on Social Security Administration Commissioner. The plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of the complaint and this order on the defendant by certified mail, return receipt requested, as well as the US Attorney General and US Attorney for Western District/Arkansas without prepayment of fees and costs. Defendant is to answer within 60 days from the date of service. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on October 13, 2021. (cla) |
||
Tuesday, October 12, 2021 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Requested as to USA
Tue 10/12 5:07 PM
THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested for USA Agency, Corporation, Officers or Employees as to Kijakazi, Acting Commr SSA and USAtty and Atty Genl Garland for service of the following document: 2 Complaint. (McKinnon, Laura) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis Service
Tue 10/12 5:06 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis , MOTION for Service by Tina J. Duncan. (McKinnon, Laura) |
|
2 | 2
cmp
Complaint
Tue 10/12 5:05 PM
COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner, filed by Tina J. Duncan.(McKinnon, Laura) |
|
1 | 1
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Tue 10/12 9:19 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Tina J. Duncan. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s). If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day your case may be terminated . (jlm) |