Sean Collins v. Warden Canaan FPC
Original Case: 3:20-cv-02230
Third Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:21-cv-02878 |
Type | civil / united states as party / usc 2241-prisoner |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Case Filed: | Oct 12, 2021 |
Terminated: | Jul 14, 2022 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 18, 2023 9:32 PM EDT |
Defendant - Appellee
WARDEN CANAAN FPC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
SEAN COLLINS
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2023 9:32 PM EDT |
Tuesday, October 12, 2021 | ||
RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (PDB) | ||
CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Sean Collins in District Court No. 3-20-cv-02230. (PDB) | ||
Att: 1 2 pgs Civil Case Docketed | ||
Att: 2 1 pgs District Court Order dated 092321 | ||
Att: 3 14 pgs District Court Memorandum | ||
Att: 4 1 pgs Case Caption | ||
Att: 5 2 pgs Case Opening Letter |