American River Trans v. Pucheu
Fifth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:21-pcf-30635 |
Type | private civil federal / private |
Nature of Suit | 380 Torts - Personal Property - Other Personal Property Damage |
Case Filed: | Oct 12, 2021 |
Terminated: | Dec 15, 2021 |
Last checked: Thursday Dec 16, 2021 2:28 AM CST |
Claimant - Appellant
Rita Pucheu, Individually and in Her Capacity as Representative of the Estate of Shawn Pucheu
|
Represented By
|
Claimant - Appellee
Eco Services Operations Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Petitioner - Appellee
American River Transportation Company, L.L.C., As Owner and Operator of the M/V Cooperative Spirit, Praying for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability
|
Represented By
|
Petitioner - Appellee
Glory First, Limited, as Owner and Managing Owner of the M/V Glory First, Petitioning for Exoneration from, or Limitation of Liability
|
Represented By
|
Petitioner - Appellee
Erasmus Corporation, as Owner and Managing Owner of the M/V Glory First, Petitioning for Exoneration from, or Limitation of Liability
|
Represented By
|
Petitioner - Appellee
Glory Ships S Pte, Limited
|
Represented By
|
Petitioner - Appellee
Elite Towing, Incorporated, as owner and operator of the M/V RC Creppel for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability
|
Represented By
|
Petitioner - Appellee
Rodgers Marine Towing Services, Limited, as owner and operator of the M/V RC Creppel for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12/16/2021 2:28 AM CST |
Tuesday, October 12, 2021 | ||
2 pgs PRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Ms. Rita Pucheu 21-30635 (WMJ) |