Mortera v. State Farm Fire and Cslty
Original Case: 1:20-cv-00224
Fifth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:21-pcd-60785 |
Type | private civil diversity / private |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Case Filed: | Oct 12, 2021 |
Terminated: | May 24, 2022 |
Last checked: Wednesday May 25, 2022 3:24 AM CDT |
Defendant - Appellee
State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Gilberto Alarcon Mortera
|
Represented By
|
GPO
May 24 2022
UNPUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [21-60785 Affirmed ] Judge: JES , Judge: CES , Judge: JEG. Mandate issue date is 06/15/2022 [21-60785] |
Docket last updated: 05/25/2022 3:24 AM CDT |
Tuesday, October 12, 2021 | ||
26 pgs PRIVATE CIVIL DIVERSITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Gilberto Alarcon Mortera. 21-60785 (DLJ) |