Gia Parmer vs. The Traditional Bakery, Inc.
Arkansas Western District Court | |
Judge: | P K Holmes III |
Case #: | 5:21-cv-05182 |
Nature of Suit | 710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause | 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act |
Case Filed: | Oct 13, 2021 |
Terminated: | Jan 20, 2022 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 12, 2022 4:51 AM CDT |
Defendant
The Traditional Bakery, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Gia Parmer
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, January 20, 2022 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Clerk's Order Dismissing Case/Party
Thu 01/20 11:06 AM
CLERK'S ORDER Dismissing Case re7 Motion for Voluntary Dismissal of Case filed by Gia Parmer (CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE). (lgd) |
|
Wednesday, January 19, 2022 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Dismiss Case
Wed 01/19 12:24 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Case Motion for Voluntary Non-Suit of Plaintiffs Complaint by Gia Parmer. (Sanford, Josh) |
|
Wednesday, January 12, 2022 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Extend
Wed 01/12 9:05 AM
MOTION to Extend Time for Service of Process by Gia Parmer. (Sanford, Josh) |
|
Wednesday, October 13, 2021 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Wed 10/13 4:30 PM
THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to The Traditional Bakery, Inc. and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (lgd) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Magistrate Notice/Consent Form
Wed 10/13 4:18 PM
Magistrate Notice/Consent Form furnished. (lgd) |
|
3 | 3
service
Summons Requested
Wed 10/13 4:07 PM
THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to The Traditional Bakery, Inc. for service of the following document: 2 Complaint. (Sanford, Josh) |
|
2 | 2
cmp
Complaint
Wed 10/13 4:06 PM
COMPLAINT against The Traditional Bakery, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AARWDC-2476002), filed by Gia Parmer.(Sanford, Josh) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Consent to Join -- Gia Parmer | ||
1 | 1
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Wed 10/13 3:39 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Gia Parmer. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s). If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day your case may be terminated . (tg) |