Catholic Charities of Southwest Kansas v. PHL Variable Insurance Company
Original Case: 6:20-cv-01334
Tenth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:21-cv-03187 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Case Filed: | Oct 12, 2021 |
Terminated: | Jul 25, 2023 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 26, 2023 2:32 AM MDT |
Defendant - Appellee
PHL VARIABLE INSURANCE COMPANY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
CATHOLIC CHARITIES OF SOUTHWEST KANSAS, INC.
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Jul 25 2023
[11015969] Affirmed. Terminated on the merits after oral hearing. Written, signed, published; Judges Bacharach, Murphy and Carson (authoring judge). Mandate to issue. [21-3187] |
Docket last updated: 07/26/2023 2:32 AM MDT |
Tuesday, October 12, 2021 | ||
[10864185] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 10/12/2021. Docketing statement, transcript order form and notice of appearance due on 10/26/2021 for Catholic Charities of Southwest Kansas, Inc., notice of appearance due on 10/26/21 for PHL Variable Insurance Company. 21-3187 | ||
Att: 1 16 pgs Transmittal letter and preliminary record | ||
Att: 2 3 pgs General Docket Letter - Counsel - Civil |