Seville v. Maersk Line
Original Case: 2:20-cv-02727
Fifth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:21-pcf-30636 |
Type | private civil federal / private |
Nature of Suit | 340 Torts - Personal Injury - Marine |
Case Filed: | Oct 13, 2021 |
Terminated: | Nov 18, 2022 |
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 22, 2022 2:34 AM CST |
Defendant - Appellee
Maersk Line, Limited
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Stacy Seville, as Personal Representative of Peter Wojcikowski
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Nov 18 2022
PUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [21-30636 Affirmed ] Judge: EHJ , Judge: LHS , Judge: ASO. Mandate issue date is 12/12/2022 [21-30636] |
Docket last updated: 11/22/2022 2:34 AM CST |
Wednesday, October 13, 2021 | ||
2 pgs PRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Ms. Stacy Seville 21-30636 (AGL) |