Uptown Grill v. Camellia Grill Holdings
Fifth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:21-pcf-30639 |
Type | private civil federal / private |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Case Filed: | Oct 13, 2021 |
Terminated: | Aug 23, 2022 |
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 24, 2022 3:25 AM CDT |
Defendant - Appellant
Camellia Grill Holdings, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant/Cross-Appellee
Camellia Grill Holdings, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Grill Holdings, L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Chartres Grill, L.L.C., doing business as Grill
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Uptown Grill of Destin, L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Rano, L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Hicham Khodr
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
K & L Investments, L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Robert's Gumbo Shop, L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee/Cross-Appellant
Robert's Gumbo Shop, L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee/Cross-Appellant
K & L Investments, L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee/Cross-Appellant
Hicham Khodr
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee/Cross-Appellant
Rano, L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee/Cross-Appellant
Uptown Grill of Destin, L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee/Cross-Appellant
Chartres Grill, L.L.C., doing business as Grill
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee/Cross-Appellant
Grill Holdings, L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Uptown Grill, L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee/Cross-Appellant
Uptown Grill, L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Aug 23 2022
PUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [21-30639 Affirmed ] Judge: PEH , Judge: SAH , Judge: ASO. Mandate issue date is 09/14/2022 [21-30639] |
Docket last updated: 08/24/2022 3:25 AM CDT |
Wednesday, October 13, 2021 | ||
2 pgs PRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Camellia Grill Holdings, Inc. 21-30639 (MAS) |