Boston Road Service & Charter Corp.
Massachusetts Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Janet E Bostwick |
Case #: | 1:21-bk-11491 |
Case Filed: | Oct 14, 2021 |
Terminated: | Jun 07, 2022 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $500,001 to $1 million |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Small Business | Yes |
Debtor
Boston Road Service & Charter Corp.
144 Devon St
Taunton, MA 02780-7238 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Assistant U.S. Trustee
John Fitzgerald
Office of the US Trustee J.W. McCormack Post Office & Courthouse 5 Post Office Sq., 10th Fl, Suite 1000
Boston, MA 02109 |
Docket last updated: 2 minutes ago |
Friday, June 10, 2022 | ||
120 | 120
trustee
Ch. 11 Subch V Trustee's Report of No Distribution E-consensual plan consummated, fee award only
Fri 06/10 1:08 PM
Chapter 11 Subchapter V Trustees Report of No Distribution. Funds Collected: $0.00. Key information about this case as reported in schedules filed by the debtor(s) or otherwise found in the case record: This case was pending for 8 months. Assets Abandoned (without deducting any secured claims): $761106.22, Assets Exempt: Not Available, Claims Scheduled: $1647604.75, Claims Asserted: Not Available, Claims scheduled to be discharged without payment (without deducting the value of collateral or debts excepted from discharge): $1647604.75. (Weiss, Steven) |
|
Tuesday, June 07, 2022 | ||
119 | 119
order
Final Decree
Tue 06/07 9:31 AM
Order of Final Decree dated 6/7/2022 Re:107 Motion filed by Debtor Boston Road Service & Charter Corp. for Final Decree. THE ESTATE OF THE DEBTOR, BOSTON ROAD SERVICE & CHARTER CORP., HAVING BEEN FULLY ADMINISTERED, THE CASE IS CLOSED. (cl) |
|
court
Close Bankruptcy Case (Ch.11 Only)
Tue 06/07 9:34 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (cl) |
||
Monday, June 06, 2022 | ||
118 | 118
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Final Decree
Mon 06/06 3:05 PM
Order dated 6/6/2022 Re:107 Motion filed by Debtor Boston Road Service & Charter Corp. for Final Decree. HAVING REVIEWED THE MOTION, GOOD CAUSE BEING SHOWN, AND NO OBJECTIONS HAVING BEEN FILED, THE MOTION IS GRANTED AS FOLLOWS. THE COURT WILL ENTER THE FINAL DECREE BY SEPARATE ORDER. THE HEARING SCHEDULED FOR JUNE 7, 2022, IS CANCELED. (cl) |
|
117 | 117
1
pgs
order
Order on Application for Compensation
Mon 06/06 2:55 PM
Order dated 6/6/2022 Re:106 Second and Final Application for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for David B. Madoff, Debtor's Attorney. HAVING REVIEWED THE APPLICATION, NO OBJECTIONS HAVING BEEN FILED AND GOOD CAUSE BEING SHOWN, THE APPLICATION IS GRANTED. MADOFF & KHOURY LLP IS ALLOWED COMPENSATION FOR THE APPLICATION PERIOD IN THE AMOUNT OF $11,219.45, INCLUDING $9,296.50 FOR FEES AND $1,922.95 IN EXPENSES, ON A FINAL BASIS. IN ADDITION, THE FEES OF $17,190.00 AND EXPENSES OF $809.67 PREVIOUSLY ALLOWED ON AN INTERIM BASIS ARE APPROVED ON A FINAL BASIS. THE HEARING SCHEDULED FOR JUNE 7, 2022, IS CANCELED. (cl) |
|
116 | 116
1
pgs
order
Order on Application for Compensation
Mon 06/06 12:54 PM
Order dated 6/6/2022 Re:110 Second Interim Application for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses. HAVING REVIEWED THE APPLICATION, NO OBJECTIONS HAVING BEEN FILED AND GOOD CAUSE BEING SHOWN, THE APPLICATION IS GRANTED. MADOFF & KHOURY LLP IS ALLOWED COMPENSATION FOR THE APPLICATION PERIOD IN THE AMOUNT OF $11,219.45, INCLUDING $9,296.50 FOR FEES AND $1,922.95 IN EXPENSES, ON A FINAL BASIS. IN ADDITION, THE FEES OF $17,190.00 AND EXPENSES OF $809.67 PREVIOUSLY ALLOWED ON AN INTERIM BASIS ARE APPROVED ON A FINAL BASIS. THE HEARING SCHEDULED FOR JUNE 7, 2022, IS CANCELED. (cl) |