Tennessee Eastern District Court
Judge:Charles E Atchley, Jr
Referred: Debra C Poplin
Case #: 3:21-cv-00353
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Oct 14, 2021
Terminated:Jul 26, 2022
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 12, 2022 6:44 AM EDT
Defendant
Erie Construction Mid-West, Inc.
Represented By
Bradford G Harvey
Miller & Martin, Pllc (chattanooga)
contact info
Plaintiff
Danielle Tessier
Represented By
James W Friauf
Law Office Of James W. Friauf, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Tuesday, July 26, 2022
17 17 order Judgment Tue 07/26 5:21 PM
JUDGMENT re 14 Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment AND 16 ORDER. (BJL) (Main Document 17 replaced on 7/26/2022) (BJL)
Related: [-]
16 16 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Tue 07/26 5:04 PM
ORDER: Accordingly, as the parties have completed all that is procedurally required, the Motion to Approve Terms of Accepted Offer of Judgment [Doc. 15 ] is STRICKEN as MOOT. This case shall be DISMISSED and CLOSED. The clerk is again DIRECTED to enter judgment in this matter. Signed by District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr on 7/26/2022. (BJL)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 22, 2022
15 15 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 07/22 3:03 PM
Joint MOTION to Approve Terms of Accepted Offer of Judgment by Erie Construction Mid-West, Inc..(Harvey, Bradford)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Other Proposed Order
Wednesday, July 20, 2022
14 14 notice Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment Wed 07/20 10:42 AM
NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by Danielle Tessier(Friauf, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Other Offer of Judgment
Monday, February 28, 2022
13 13 order Scheduling Order Mon 02/28 4:17 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 5/23/2023 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1A - Chattanooga before District Judge Charles E Atchley Jr.. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/8/2023 03:00 PM in Courtroom 1A - Chattanooga before District Judge Charles E Atchley Jr..Signed by District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr on 2/28/2022. (BDG)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 09, 2022
12 12 notice Notice (Other) Wed 02/09 3:40 PM
NOTICE by Danielle Tessier of Service of Plaintiff's Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures (Friauf, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 04, 2022
11 11 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Fri 02/04 5:23 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Harvey, Bradford)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 02, 2022
10 10 notice Notice (Other) Wed 02/02 10:10 AM
NOTICE by Danielle Tessier of Service of Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories and First Set of Requests for Production of Documents and Things to Defendant (Friauf, James)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 10, 2022
9 9 notice Notice of Consent/Nonconsent Mon 01/10 11:39 AM
NOTICE OF NONCONSENT by Danielle Tessier (Friauf, James)
Related: [-]
8 8 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Mon 01/10 8:41 AM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Scheduling Conference set for 2/28/2022 02:30 PM in Judge's Chambers (Telephonic Hearing) before District Judge Charles E Atchley Jr..Signed by District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr on 1/10/2022. (BDG)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 14, 2021
7 7 1 pgs order Order Regarding Availability of Magistrate Judge Tue 12/14 4:03 PM
ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr on 12/14/21. (ABF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 12/14 3:04 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Erie Construction Mid-West, Inc..(Harvey, Bradford)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 21, 2021
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 10/21 9:20 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Danielle Tessier. Erie Construction Mid-West, Inc. waiver sent on 10/15/2021. (Friauf, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 15, 2021
4 4 3 pgs order Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information Fri 10/15 8:49 AM
Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information.Signed by District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr on October 15, 2021. (SAC)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs order Order Governing Motions To Dismiss Fri 10/15 8:49 AM
Order Governing Motions To Dismiss.Signed by District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr on October 15, 2021. (SAC)
Related: [-]
2 2 1 pgs order Order Governing Depositions Fri 10/15 8:48 AM
Order Governing Depositions.Signed by District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr on October 15, 2021. (SAC)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Fri 10/15 8:47 AM
District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. (SAC)
Related: [-]
service Summons NOT Issued Fri 10/15 8:51 AM
No summons received with initiating documents. Therefore, summons not issued as to Erie Construction Mid-West, Inc... (SAC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 14, 2021
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 10/14 4:10 PM
COMPLAINT against Erie Construction Mid-West, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNEDC-4871700.), filed by Danielle Tessier.(Friauf, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Other Civil Cover Sheet