Kucera, et al v. United States
Original Case: 1:21-cv-00811
Tenth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:21-cv-02123 |
Type | civil / usa as party |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Oct 13, 2021 |
Terminated: | Apr 14, 2022 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 15, 2022 2:33 AM MDT |
Defendant - Appellee
UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
|
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
GREGORY EDWARD KUCERA
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
BARBARA BLESSING-KUCERA
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
GREGORY E. KUCERA
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/15/2022 2:33 AM MDT |
Wednesday, October 13, 2021 | ||
[10864759] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 10/13/2021 Fee is due and ntice of entry of appearance due by 11/15/2021 for Barbara Blessing-Kucera and Gregory Edward Kucera. 21-2123 | ||
Att: 1 5 pgs Main Document | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs General Docketing Letter - Pro Se |