Crownhart v. Aurora Police Department, et al
Original Case: 1:21-cv-02472
Tenth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:21-cv-01349 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Oct 13, 2021 |
Terminated: | Jan 21, 2022 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 25, 2022 1:29 AM MST |
Defendant - Appellee
AURORA POLICE DEPARTMENT
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
DORKINS
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
DORKINS, Officer
|
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
EARL CROWNHART
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Jan 21 2022
[10887398] Default; Procedural termination without judicial action; Clerk of the Court. [21-1349] |
Docket last updated: 01/25/2022 1:29 AM MST |
Wednesday, October 13, 2021 | ||
[10864802] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 10/13/2201. Notice of appearance due on 11/12/2021 for Earl Crownhart. Fee or ifp forms due 11/12/2021 for Earl Crownhart. 21-1349 | ||
Att: 1 18 pgs Main Document | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs General Docketing Letter - Pro Se |