Adorers of the Blood of Chris, et al v. Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line
Original Case: 5:20-cv-05627
Third Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:21-cv-02898 |
Type | civil / private / civil rights |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Oct 14, 2021 |
Terminated: | Nov 08, 2022 |
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 09, 2022 3:35 AM EST |
Defendant - Appellee
TRANSCONTINENTAL GAS PIPE LINE CO LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
ADORERS OF THE BLOOD OF CHRIST UNITED STATES PROVINCE, n/k/a Adorers of the Blood of Christ, United States Region, Successor by Merger to Adorers of the Blood of Christ, Province of Columbia, PA, Inc. formerly known as Saint Joseph Convent Motherhouse of t
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
SISTER SARA DWYER
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
SISTER MARIA HUGHES
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
SISTER DANI BROUGHT
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
SISTER MARY ALAN WURTH
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
SISTER THERESE MARIE SMITH
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Nov 08 2022
PRECEDENTIAL OPINION. Coram: KRAUSE, BIBAS and RENDELL, Circuit Judges. Total Pages: 25. Judge: RENDELL Authoring. |
Docket last updated: 11/09/2022 3:35 AM EST |
Thursday, October 14, 2021 | ||
RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (SB) | ||
CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellants Adorers of the Blood of Christ United States Province, Dani Brought, Sara Dwyer, Maria Hughes, Therese Marie Smith and Mary Alan Wurth in District Court No. 5-10-cv-05627. (SB) | ||
Att: 1 3 pgs Notice of Appeal | ||
Att: 2 1 pgs District Court Order | ||
Att: 3 8 pgs District Court Memorandum | ||
Att: 4 1 pgs Case Caption | ||
Att: 5 1 pgs Standing Order | ||
Att: 6 3 pgs Case Opening Letter |