Hignell-Stark v. City of New Orleans
Original Case: 2:19-cv-13773
Fifth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:21-pcf-30643 |
Type | private civil federal / private |
Nature of Suit | 290 Real Property - All Other Real Property |
Case Filed: | Oct 14, 2021 |
Terminated: | Aug 22, 2022 |
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 23, 2022 3:26 AM CDT |
Defendant - Appellee
City of New Orleans
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee/Cross-Appellant
City of New Orleans
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
White Spider Rental Concierge, L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Jimmie Taylor
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Bob McRaney
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Samantha McRaney
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Russell Frank
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Garett Majoue
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Melissa Hignell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant/Cross-Appellee
Melissa Hignell
|
|
Plaintiff - Appellant/Cross-Appellee
Hignell-Stark
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant/Cross-Appellee
White Spider Rental Concierge, L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant/Cross-Appellee
Garett Majoue
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant/Cross-Appellee
Russell Frank
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant/Cross-Appellee
Samantha McRaney
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant/Cross-Appellee
Bob McRaney
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant/Cross-Appellee
Jimmie Taylor
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Aug 22 2022
PUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [21-30643 Affirmed in Part] Judge: JES, Judge: JLW, Judge: LHS Mandate issue date is 09/13/2022 [21-30643] |
Docket last updated: 08/23/2022 3:26 AM CDT |
Thursday, October 14, 2021 | ||
1 pgs PRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Mr. Russell Frank, Ms. Melissa Hignell, Mr. Garett Majoue, Mr. Bob McRaney, Ms. Samantha McRaney, Mr. Jimmie Taylor and White Spider Rental Concierge, L.L.C. 21-30643 (WMJ) |