Sneed v. Austin Indep School Dist
Original Case: 1:19-cv-00608
Fifth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:21-cr-50966 |
Type | civil rights / private |
Nature of Suit | 448 Civil Rights - Education |
Case Filed: | Oct 14, 2021 |
Terminated: | Oct 04, 2022 |
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 05, 2022 3:29 AM CDT |
Defendant - Appellee
Austin Independent School District
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Camron Sneed
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Oct 04 2022
PUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [21-50966 Affirmed ] Judge: EBC , Judge: SKD , Judge: CTW. Mandate issue date is 10/26/2022 [21-50966] |
Docket last updated: 10/05/2022 3:29 AM CDT |
Thursday, October 14, 2021 | ||
2 pgs CIVIL RIGHTS CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Ms. Camron Sneed 21-50966 (CBW) |