NY Life Ins v. Shelton
Original Case: 4:21-cv-00490
Fifth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:21-pcd-11037 |
Type | private civil diversity / private |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Case Filed: | Oct 14, 2021 |
Terminated: | Mar 22, 2022 |
Last checked: Saturday Mar 26, 2022 3:31 AM CDT |
Defendant - Appellant
Bob Shelton, as Trustee of Barbara Jean Brown Living Trust DTD 5/29/2018
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
New York Life Insurance and Annuity Corporation
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Mar 22 2022
UNPUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [21-11037 Affirmed ] Judge: WED , Judge: EHJ , Judge: JWE. Mandate issue date is 04/13/2022 [21-11037] |
Docket last updated: 03/26/2022 3:31 AM CDT |
Thursday, October 14, 2021 | ||
3 pgs PRIVATE CIVIL DIVERSITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Bob Shelton 21-11037 (MVM) |