Sosa v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Arkansas Western District Court | |
Judge: | Timothy L Brooks |
Case #: | 5:21-cv-05186 |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Cause | 42:0405g Review of HHS Decision (RSI) |
Case Filed: | Oct 15, 2021 |
Terminated: | Feb 02, 2023 |
Defendant
Social Security Administration Commissioner
|
|
Plaintiff
Marsha Sosa
|
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Monday, March 27, 2023 | ||
27 | 27
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Attorney Fees Order on Report and Recommendations Judgment - Attorney Fees
Mon 03/27 10:16 AM
ORDER ADOPTING IN ITS ENTIRETY26 Report and Recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge; GRANTING19 ,23 Motions for Attorney Fees in the amount of $5079.60 attorney fees. This amount should be paid in addition to, and not out of, any past due benefits which plaintiff may be awarded in the future. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on March 27, 2023. (lgd) |
|
Friday, March 10, 2023 | ||
26 | 26
motion
Report and Recommendations
Fri 03/10 11:54 AM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re23 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Marsha Sosa,19 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Marsha Sosa. Objections to R&R due by 3/24/2023. Signed by Honorable Christy D. Comstock on March 10, 2023. (tg) |
|
Thursday, March 09, 2023 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Response
Thu 03/09 7:40 PM
RESPONSE by Social Security Administration Commissioner re23 MOTION for Attorney Fees . (Silverman, Marisa) |
|
24 | 24
msupport
Memorandum Brief in Support
Thu 03/09 3:54 PM
MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of23 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Marsha Sosa. (McKinnon, Laura) |
|
23 | 23
motion
Attorney Fees
Thu 03/09 3:53 PM
MOTION for Attorney Fees by Marsha Sosa.Motions referred to Christy D. Comstock.(McKinnon, Laura) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Itemization, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit CPI 1, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit CPI 2, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit CPI 3 | ||
Monday, March 06, 2023 | ||
22 | 22
order
Order Referring Motion
Mon 03/06 9:25 AM
TEXT ONLY ORDER REFERRING MOTION:19 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Marsha Sosa to Honorable Christy D. Comstock. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on 3/6/23. Motions referred to Christy D. Comstock.(slc) |
|
21 | 21
utility
Case Referred to Magistrate Judge
Mon 03/06 9:25 AM
CASE REFERRED to Honorable Christy D. Comstock. Motions referred to Honorable Christy D. Comstock.(lgd) |
|
20 | 20
msupport
Memorandum Brief in Support
Mon 03/06 9:23 AM
MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of19 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Marsha Sosa. (lgd) |
|
19 | 19
motion
Attorney Fees
Mon 03/06 9:17 AM
MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA by Marsha Sosa. (lgd) |
|
Thursday, February 02, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
order
Judgment - SSA
Thu 02/02 11:01 AM
JUDGMENT REVERSING THE DECISION OF THE COMMISSIONER AND REMANDING THIS CASE TO THE COMMISSIONER FOR FURTHER CONSIDERATION PURSUANT TO SENTENCE FOUR of 42 U.S.C. 405(g). Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on February 2, 2023. (lgd) |
|
17 | 17
1
pgs
order
Order on Report and Recommendations Order Adopting Report and Recommendations
Thu 02/02 10:52 AM
ORDER ADOPTING16 Report and Recommendations IN ITS ENTIRETY; the decision of the ALJ is REVERSED AND REMANDED. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on February 2, 2023. (lgd) |
|
Wednesday, January 18, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Report and Recommendations
Wed 01/18 8:40 AM
MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re2 Complaint filed by Marsha Sosa. Objections to R&R due by 2/1/2023. Signed by Honorable Christy D. Comstock on January 18, 2023. (lgd) |
|
Wednesday, May 25, 2022 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Appeal Brief (Social Security-Govt)
Wed 05/25 5:50 PM
APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Silverman, Marisa) |
|
Wednesday, May 11, 2022 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Appeal Brief (Social Security-Plaintiff)
Wed 05/11 2:55 PM
APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Marsha Sosa. (McKinnon, Laura) |
|
Monday, April 11, 2022 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Social Security Transcript
Mon 04/11 11:33 AM
SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner.(Taylor, Candace) |
|
Att: 1 Supplement Part 2 of 74, | ||
Att: 2 Supplement Part 3 of 74, | ||
Att: 3 Supplement Part 4 of 74, | ||
Att: 4 Supplement Part 5 of 74, | ||
Att: 5 Supplement Part 6 of 74, | ||
Att: 6 Supplement Part 7 of 74, | ||
Att: 7 Supplement Part 8 of 74, | ||
Att: 8 Supplement Part 9 of 74, | ||
Att: 9 Supplement Part 10 of 74, | ||
Att: 10 Supplement Part 11 of 74, | ||
Att: 11 Supplement Part 12 of 74, | ||
Att: 12 Supplement Part 13 of 74, | ||
Att: 13 Supplement Part 14 of 74, | ||
Att: 14 Supplement Part 15 of 74, | ||
Att: 15 Supplement Part 16 of 74, | ||
Att: 16 Supplement Part 17 of 74, | ||
Att: 17 Supplement Part 18 of 74, | ||
Att: 18 Supplement Part 19 of 74, | ||
Att: 19 Supplement Part 20 of 74, | ||
Att: 20 Supplement Part 21 of 74, | ||
Att: 21 Supplement Part 22 of 74, | ||
Att: 22 Supplement Part 23 of 74, | ||
Att: 23 Supplement Part 24 of 74, | ||
Att: 24 Supplement Part 25 of 74, | ||
Att: 25 Supplement Part 26 of 74, | ||
Att: 26 Supplement Part 27 of 74, | ||
Att: 27 Supplement Part 28 of 74, | ||
Att: 28 Supplement Part 29 of 74, | ||
Att: 29 Supplement Part 30 of 74, | ||
Att: 30 Supplement Part 31 of 74, | ||
Att: 31 Supplement Part 32 of 74, | ||
Att: 32 Supplement Part 33 of 74, | ||
Att: 33 Supplement Part 34 of 74, | ||
Att: 34 Supplement Part 35 of 74, | ||
Att: 35 Supplement Part 36 of 74, | ||
Att: 36 Supplement Part 37 of 74, | ||
Att: 37 Supplement Part 38 of 74, | ||
Att: 38 Supplement Part 39 of 74, | ||
Att: 39 Supplement Part 40 of 74, | ||
Att: 40 Supplement Part 41 of 74, | ||
Att: 41 Supplement Part 42 of 74, | ||
Att: 42 Supplement Part 43 of 74, | ||
Att: 43 Supplement Part 44 of 74, | ||
Att: 44 Supplement Part 45 of 74, | ||
Att: 45 Supplement Part 46 of 74, | ||
Att: 46 Supplement Part 47 of 74, | ||
Att: 47 Supplement Part 48 of 74, | ||
Att: 48 Supplement Part 49 of 74, | ||
Att: 49 Supplement Part 50 of 74, | ||
Att: 50 Supplement Part 51 of 74, | ||
Att: 51 Supplement Part 52 of 74, | ||
Att: 52 Supplement Part 53 of 74, | ||
Att: 53 Supplement Part 54 of 74, | ||
Att: 54 Supplement Part 55 of 74, | ||
Att: 55 Supplement Part 56 of 74, | ||
Att: 56 Supplement Part 57 of 74, | ||
Att: 57 Supplement Part 58 of 74, | ||
Att: 58 Supplement Part 59 of 74, | ||
Att: 59 Supplement Part 60 of 74, | ||
Att: 60 Supplement Part 61 of 74, | ||
Att: 61 Supplement Part 62 of 74, | ||
Att: 62 Supplement Part 63 of 74, | ||
Att: 63 Supplement Part 64 of 74, | ||
Att: 64 Supplement Part 65 of 74, | ||
Att: 65 Supplement Part 66 of 74, | ||
Att: 66 Supplement Part 67 of 74, | ||
Att: 67 Supplement Part 68 of 74, | ||
Att: 68 Supplement Part 69 of 74, | ||
Att: 69 Supplement Part 70 of 74, | ||
Att: 70 Supplement Part 71 of 74, | ||
Att: 71 Supplement Part 72 of 74, | ||
Att: 72 Supplement Part 73 of 74, | ||
Att: 73 Supplement Part 74 of 74 | ||
order
Social Security Scheduling Order - CDC
Mon 04/11 11:41 AM
TEXT ONLY SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER. Plaintiff must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date of the filing of the transcript. Plaintiff's failure to file a timely brief may result in dismissal for failure to prosecute. Defendant must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date Plaintiff's brief is served. The parties' briefs shall not contain a recitation of the procedural history, evidence, or standard of review. Plaintiffs brief shall be limited solely to the specific points for appeal and a discussion of the pertinent evidence as related to those points (including transcript page citations for this evidence). Defendants brief shall address the issues raised in Plaintiffs brief and may include additional relevant issues, with a discussion of the pertinent evidence as related to these issues (including transcript page citations for this evidence). A reply brief may be filed within seven (7) days after the response brief is filed, and shall be limited to those issues raised in the response brief that were not previously addressed. All briefs must include citations to applicable case-law supporting the parties positions. No extension of time to file a brief will be granted unless it is timely and establishes good cause for an extension. The briefs should be no longer than ten (10) pages in length. Any brief exceeding the page limitation imposed herein may be stricken from the record. Plaintiffs SSA Appeal Brief due by 5/11/2022. Signed by Honorable Christy D. Comstock on April 11, 2022. (caz) |
||
Friday, April 08, 2022 | ||
11 | 11
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney filed Complaint)
Fri 04/08 2:56 PM
ANSWER to2 Complaint by Social Security Administration Commissioner.(Silverman, Marisa) |
|
Tuesday, March 01, 2022 | ||
10 | 10
service
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
Tue 03/01 2:15 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marsha Sosa. Social Security Administration Commissioner served on 2/14/2022, answer due 4/15/2022. (McKinnon, Laura) |
|
notice
Clerk's Notice re Proof of Service Due
Tue 03/01 12:48 PM
TEXT ONLY CLERK'S NOTICE regarding Proof of Service. The docket does not reflect that proof of service or a motion and order to extend the time to complete service has been filed regarding U.S. Attorney located in Fort Smith, AR. No answer or other responsive pleading has been filed by the Defendant. The Plaintiff is directed to file proof of timely service, or a statement as to when such proof will be filed, within five (5) days of the filing of this Notice. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). Proof of Service due by 3/7/2022. (src) |
||
Wednesday, January 05, 2022 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
Wed 01/05 8:20 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marsha Sosa. Social Security Administration Commissioner served on 11/15/2021, answer due 1/14/2022. (McKinnon, Laura) |
|
Monday, October 18, 2021 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Consent/Reassignment - SSA
Mon 10/18 12:18 PM
REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT to a District Judge for entry of the final judgment or order by Marsha Sosa. (McKinnon, Laura) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Mon 10/18 10:09 AM
THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (tg) |
|
misc
Clerk's Order of Judge Assignment
Mon 10/18 1:38 PM
TEXT ONLY CLERK'S ORDER OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT to a District Judge. Case reassigned to presiding judge Honorable Timothy L. Brooks and Honorable Christy D. Comstock, as the referral judge. (lgd) |
||
Friday, October 15, 2021 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Magistrate Notice - SSA
Fri 10/15 4:58 PM
NOTICE OF DIRECT ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE. This case has been assigned to a U.S. Magistrate Judge to conduct all proceedings and for entry of a final judgment. You must file the attached form memorializing consent or requesting reassignment to a District Judge within fourteen (14) days. Consent or Reassignment form due by 10/29/2021.(tg) |
|
Att: 1 Consent/Reassignment Form | ||
5 | 5
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Order on Motion for Service
Fri 10/15 2:37 PM
ORDER granting3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; granting3 Motion for Service and DIRECTING SERVICE on Social Security Administration Commissioner. The plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of the complaint and this order on the defendant by certified mail, return receipt requested, as well as the US Attorney General and US Attorney for Western District/Arkansas without prepayment of fees and costs. Defendant is to answer within 60 days from the date of service. Signed by Honorable Christy D. Comstock on October 15, 2021. (tg) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Requested as to USA
Fri 10/15 2:13 PM
THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested for USA Agency, Corporation, Officers or Employees as to Kijakazi, Acting Commr SSA and USAtty and Atty Genl Garland for service of the following document: 2 Complaint. (McKinnon, Laura) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis Service
Fri 10/15 2:12 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis , MOTION for Service by Marsha Sosa. (McKinnon, Laura) |
|
2 | 2
cmp
Complaint
Fri 10/15 2:11 PM
COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner, filed by Marsha Sosa.(McKinnon, Laura) |
|
1 | 1
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Fri 10/15 1:10 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Marsha Sosa. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s). If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day your case may be terminated . (lgd) |