American Verification Procession v. Electronic Payment Systems, LLC, et al
Original Case: 1:19-cv-02902
Tenth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:21-cv-01356 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Case Filed: | Oct 14, 2021 |
Terminated: | Nov 15, 2021 |
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 17, 2021 1:27 AM MST |
Defendant - Appellee
ELECTRONIC PAYMENT SYSTEMS, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
ESQUIRE MERCHANT SERVICES, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
AMERICAN VERIFICATION PROCESSION SOLUTIONS, LLC
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Nov 15 2021
[10872160] Frap 42; Procedural termination without judicial action by Clerk of Court.. [21-1356] |
Docket last updated: 11/17/2021 1:27 AM MST |
Thursday, October 14, 2021 | ||
[10865077] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 10/14/2021. Docketing statement due 10/28/2021 for American Verification Procession Solutions, LLC. Transcript order form due 10/28/2021 for American Verification Procession Solutions, LLC. Notice of appearance due on 10/28/2021 for American Verification Procession Solutions, LLC, Electronic Payment Systems, LLC and Esquire Merchant Services, LLC 21-1356 | ||
Att: 1 19 pgs Main Document | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs General Docket Letter - Counsel - Civil |