Kenno v. Colorado Governor's Office, et al
Original Case: 1:19-cv-00165
Tenth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:21-cv-01353 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Case Filed: | Oct 14, 2021 |
Terminated: | Apr 17, 2023 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 18, 2023 2:30 AM MDT |
Defendant
LYUBOV LOGACHEVA
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
BOB MCINTYRE, in his individual capacity
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
DON WISDOM
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
COLORADO'S GOVERNORS OFFICE OF INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
LYUBOV LOGACHEVA, in her individual capacity
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
BOB MCINTYRE, in his individual capacity
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
DON WISDOM, in his individual and official capacities
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
COLORADO GOVERNOR'S OFFICE OF INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
YOSEPH YADESSA KENNO
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2023 2:30 AM MDT |
Thursday, October 14, 2021 | ||
[10865078] Entry of appearance submitted by JACK D. PATTEN, III for Appellees Colorado's Governors Office of Information Technology, Lyubov Logacheva, Bob McIntyre, Don Wisdom for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 10/14/2021. Manner of Service: email. 21-1353 [Edited to remove PDF as pleading has been filed-- Edited 10/14/2021 by NA] JDP | ||
[10865081] Entry of appearance submitted by LESLIE C. SCHULZE for Appellees Colorado's Governors Office of Information Technology, Lyubov Logacheva, Bob McIntyre, Don Wisdom and Appellant Yoseph Yadessa Kenno for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 10/14/2021. Manner of Service: email. 21-1353 --[Edited 10/14/2021 by LG to remove PDF from entry, as pleading was filed on 10/14/2021] LS | ||
[10865082] Entry of appearance submitted by LAUREN DAVISON for Appellees Colorado's Governors Office of Information Technology, Lyubov Logacheva, Bob McIntyre, Don Wisdom and Appellant Yoseph Yadessa Kenno for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 10/14/2021. Manner of Service: email. 21-1353 --[Edited 10/14/2021 by AT to remove PDF as pleading was filed on 10/14/2021.] LD | ||
[10865006] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 10/14/2021. Notice of appearance due on 10/28/2021 for Colorado's Governors Office of Information Technology, Lyubov Logacheva, Bob McIntyre and Don Wisdom, and Notice of appearance due on 11/15/2021 for Yoseph Yadessa Kenno. Fee or ifp forms due 11/15/2021 for Yoseph Yadessa Kenno. 21-1353 | ||
Att: 1 89 pgs Main Document | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs General Docketing Letter - Pro Se | ||
2 pgs [10865088] Entry of appearance filed by Ms. Leslie Schulze for Don Wisdom, Bob McIntyre, Lyubov Logacheva, Colorado's Governors Office of Information Technology. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 10/14/2021. Manner of Service: email 21-1353 | ||
2 pgs [10865107] Entry of appearance filed by Ms. Lauren Davison for Colorado's Governors Office of Information Technology, Lyubov Logacheva, Bob McIntyre, and Don Wisdom. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 10/14/2021. Manner of Service: email. 21-1353 | ||
2 pgs [10865232] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Jack Davy Patten, III for Colorado's Governors Office of Information Technology, Lyubov Logacheva, Bob McIntyre and Don Wisdom. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 10/14/2021. Manner of Service: email 21-1353 |