USA v. Faulkner
Original Case: 3:18-cr-00500
Fifth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:21-dcrim-11040 |
Type | criminal (dcrim) / direct criminal |
Case Filed: | Oct 15, 2021 |
Terminated: | Dec 28, 2022 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 19, 2022 11:49 AM CST |
Defendant - Appellant
Christopher Aundre Faulkner, also known as Christopher A. Faulkner
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
United States of America
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 01/19/2022 11:49 AM CST |
Friday, October 15, 2021 | ||
2 pgs DIRECT CRIMINAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Christopher Aundre Faulkner 21-11040 (MFY) |