OHT Hawk AS v. Cruz
Fifth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:21-pcf-60796 |
Type | private civil federal / private |
Nature of Suit | 120 Contract - Marine |
Case Filed: | Oct 15, 2021 |
Terminated: | May 11, 2022 |
Last checked: Thursday May 12, 2022 3:30 AM CDT |
Claimant - Appellant
Luis Cruz
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Offshore Heavy Transport AS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Songa Shipmanagement Limited
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
M/V Hawk, her engines, tackle, apparel, furniture, etc. in rem
|
Represented By
|
Petitioner - Appellee
OHT Hawk AS
|
Represented By
|
Petitioner - Appellee
OHT Management AS
|
Represented By
|
GPO
May 11 2022
UNPUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [21-60796 Affirmed ] Judge: PEH , Judge: JLD , Judge: JEG. Mandate issue date is 06/02/2022 [21-60796] |
Docket last updated: 05/12/2022 3:30 AM CDT |
Friday, October 15, 2021 | ||
2 pgs PRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Luis Cruz 21-60796 (MAS) |