Hinton v. Harris County
Original Case: 4:18-cv-00912
Fifth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:21-cr-20550 |
Type | civil rights / private |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Oct 15, 2021 |
Terminated: | Jul 14, 2022 |
Last checked: Friday Jul 15, 2022 3:29 AM CDT |
Defendant - Appellee
Harris County, care of Honorable Ed Emmentt
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Candice Hinton, Individually as personal representative of the Estate of Rodrin Hinton and as parent and natural guardian of her minor children R.H. and CH and next friend of for IH and KH
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
State of Alaska, as ward of A.H.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Brittany Kuka, parent and guardian of K.H.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Nicholas Kuka, parent and guardian of K.H.
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Jul 14 2022
UNPUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [21-20550 Affirmed ] Judge: JES , Judge: SKD , Judge: ASO. Mandate issue date is 08/05/2022 [21-20550] |
Docket last updated: 07/15/2022 3:29 AM CDT |
Friday, October 15, 2021 | ||
3 pgs CIVIL RIGHTS CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Ms. Candice Hinton, Ms. Brittany Kuka, Mr. Nicholas Kuka and State of Alaska 21-20550 (CCR) |