Hudson Spclty Ins v. Talex Enterprises
Original Case: 5:17-cv-00137
Fifth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:21-pcd-60794 |
Type | private civil diversity / private |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Case Filed: | Oct 15, 2021 |
Terminated: | Oct 28, 2022 |
Last checked: Monday Oct 31, 2022 3:27 AM CDT |
Appellant
City of McComb
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
Talex Enterprises, L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Hudson Specialty Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Oct 28 2022
UNPUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [21-60794 Affirmed in Part, Reversed in Part and Remanded] Judge: JEG , Judge: DRW , Judge: KDE. Mandate issue date is 11/21/2022 [21-60794] |
Docket last updated: 10/31/2022 3:27 AM CDT |
Friday, October 15, 2021 | ||
CASE CAPTION updated. Party information modified for Talex Enterprises, L.L.C. and City of McComb in 21-60794 21-60794 (SEP) | ||
ATTORNEY NOT PARTICIPATING. Wayne Dowdy is designated as inactive in this case. 21-60794 (SEP) | ||
4 pgs PRIVATE CIVIL DIVERSITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Talex Enterprises, L.L.C. 21-60794 (SEP) | ||
4 pgs CASE CAPTION updated. Additional appeal filed. [9689767-2] Parties added: Appellant City of McComb. NOA filed by Appellant City of McComb. [9689767-1] 21-60794 (SEP) | ||
PERMISSION TO APPEAL GRANTED. Case transferred from miscellaneous case number 21-90009 Fee due on 10/29/2021 for Appellants City of McComb and Talex Enterprises, L.L.C. 21-60794 (SEP) | ||
Att: 1 1 pgs MOT-11 Letter | ||
Att: 2 4 pgs Court Order Granting Permission to Appeal |